EP1856291 - NUCLEIC ACIDS AND PROTEINS AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verenium Corporation 4955 Directors Place San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2007/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHUR, Eric 2654 Galicia Way Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | 02 /
CHANG, Cathy 1318 Shadow Hills Drive San Marcos, California 92069 / US | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Wakerley, Helen Rachael Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Wakerley, Helen Rachael Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 06736890.2 | 03.03.2006 | [2007/47] | WO2006US07642 | Priority number, date | US20050658984P | 04.03.2005 Original published format: US 658984 P | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006096527 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1856291 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/00, C12N9/24 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
C12N9/00 (EP,US);
C12N9/88 (US);
C07K2/00 (US);
C12N9/0061 (US);
C12N9/0065 (US);
C12N9/0071 (US);
C12N9/1241 (US);
C12N9/14 (US);
C12N9/16 (US);
C12N9/2411 (US);
C12N9/2437 (US);
C12N9/2482 (US);
C12N9/78 (US);
C12N9/80 (US);
C12Q1/02 (US);
C12Q1/04 (US);
C12N9/2428 (US);
C12N9/2445 (US);
C12Y111/01016 (US);
C12Y301/03 (US);
C12Y302/01004 (US);
C12Y303/02009 (US);
C12Y305/01004 (US);
C12Y401/02 (US);
C12Y402/02002 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/47] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NUKLEINSÄUREN UND PROTEINE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2007/47] | English: | NUCLEIC ACIDS AND PROTEINS AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THEM | [2007/47] | French: | ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES ET PROTÉINES, ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION | [2007/47] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 29.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0066791 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-58 * Seq. ID No. 112; pages 26, 34-37 and 62; claims 18-24 *; | [X]WO0071725 (CHIRON SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-58 * Seq. ID NO. 5729 and 7889; claim 10 *; | [X] - MEMISOGLU A ET AL, "Cloning and characterization of a cDNA encoding a 3-methyladenine DNA glycosylase from the fission yeast Schizosaccharomyces pombe", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19961024), vol. 177, no. 1, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 229 - 235, XP004043401 [X] 1-58 * abstract; pages 229 and 230 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(96)00308-3 | [A] - O'ROURKE EYLEEN J ET AL, "A novel 3-methyladenine DNA glycosylase from Helicobacter pylori defines a new class within the endonuclease III family of base excision repair glycosylases", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20000630), vol. 275, no. 26, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 20077 - 20083, XP002514561 [A] 1-58 * page 20077 - page 20078 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M001071200 | International search | [X] - GENBANK, (20021217), Database accession no. (BZ569932), XP008092905 |