EP1861736 - MICROREPLICATED ARTICLE WITH MOIRE REDUCING SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dobbs, James N. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Nelson, John C. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | Vossius & Partner, et al P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/49] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L., et al 3M Europe S.A., Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 06737185.6 | 06.03.2006 | [2007/49] | WO2006US07977 | Priority number, date | US20050661600P | 09.03.2005 Original published format: US 661600 P | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006098940 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1861736 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B3/00, G02B5/04, B29D11/00 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
G02B3/0031 (EP,US);
G02B5/02 (KR);
G02B3/0025 (EP,US);
G02B3/005 (EP,US);
G02B3/0068 (EP,US);
G02B5/04 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROREPLIZIERTER GEGENSTAND MIT MOIRÉ-REDUZIERENDER OBERFLÄCHE | [2007/49] | English: | MICROREPLICATED ARTICLE WITH MOIRE REDUCING SURFACE | [2007/49] | French: | ARTICLE MICROREPRODUIT DOTE D UNE SURFACE REDUISANT LE MOIRE | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 03.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/31] | 17.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2005007873 ; | WO2004103683 [ ] (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP], et al); | [L]US2006062969 (HONDA MAKOTO [JP]) [L] * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0023] * * figure - *; | [PX]US2005224997 (LIAO TSUNG-NENG [TW], et al) [PX] 1-20 * abstract *; | [XA]EP0814300 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9,14-20 * abstract * * column 2, line 31 - line 40 * * figure - * [A] 10-13; | [A]US2004075897 (OOKAWA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [A]US5579164 (CHAPNIK PHILIP [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 10, line 22 - line 48 * * figure 10d *; | [A]JPH04299329 ; | [A]US2004027675 (WU MING-HSIEN [TW], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2005007873 A 20050113 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-20 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930308), vol. 017, no. 112, Database accession no. (P - 1498), & JP04299329 A 19921022 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |