EP1856566 - MICROREPLICATED ARTICLE WITH DEFECT-REDUCING SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NELSON, John C. 3m Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
CAMPBELL, Alan B. 3m Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/50] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Europe S.A./N.V. OIPC Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2007/47] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Europe S.A./N.V. OIPC Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 06737312.6 | 06.03.2006 | [2007/47] | WO2006US08127 | Priority number, date | US20050661427P | 09.03.2005 Original published format: US 661427 P | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006098958 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1856566 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/00, G02B5/04, G02B3/00, B29D11/00 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
G02B6/0038 (EP,US);
G02B5/02 (KR);
B29C59/046 (EP,US);
B32B38/06 (EP,US);
G02B3/0031 (EP,US);
G02B3/0068 (EP,US);
G02B5/04 (KR);
G02B5/045 (EP,US);
G02B6/0051 (EP,US);
G02B6/0065 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0827 (EP,US);
B29L2007/007 (EP,US);
B29L2007/008 (EP,US);
B29L2011/00 (EP,US);
B32B2037/243 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROREPLIZIERTER GEGENSTAND MIT FEHLERREDUZIERENDER OBERFLÄCHE | [2007/47] | English: | MICROREPLICATED ARTICLE WITH DEFECT-REDUCING SURFACE | [2007/47] | French: | ARTICLE MICRO-DUPLIQUE AVEC UNE SURFACE REDUISANT LES DEFAUTS | [2007/47] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 08.08.2011 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 13.10.2011 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 12.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/17] | 19.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2004099823 (REFLEXITE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,16-19,21,22 * page 1, lines 15-23 * * page 6, line 27 - page 8, line 8 * * page 11, line 23 - page 12, line 17 * * page 12, line 27 - page 14 * * figures 1,2,9,10 * [Y] 6,11-15,20; | [Y]US6577358 (ARAKAWA FUMIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 6,11-15,20 * figures 2,6 *; | [A]US2004156130 (POWELL KARLTON DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1,16 * paragraph [0064] *; | [A]WO0127527 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1,16 * page 5, lines 27-37 * * page 6, line 34 - page 7 *; | [A]WO0204858 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1,16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5592332 (NISHIO TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1,16 * figures 39c,39d * |