EP1855662 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sound Pharmaceuticals Incorporated 4010 Stone Way N., Suite 120 Seattle, WA 98103 / US | [2007/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIL, Jonathan 2509 13th Avenue W Seattle, Washington 98102 / US | 02 /
LYNCH, Eric, Daniel 17519 33rd Avenue NE Lake Forest Park, Washington 98155 / US | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Hart, Deborah Mary, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Hart, Deborah Mary, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06737379.5 | 08.03.2006 | [2007/47] | WO2006US08201 | Priority number, date | US20050661429P | 08.03.2005 Original published format: US 661429 P | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006096759 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1855662 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/095, A61K31/52, A61P35/00 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
A61K31/282 (EP,US);
A61K31/41 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/555 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/47] | A61K31/095, A61K31/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2007/47] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING CANCER | [2007/47] | French: | METHODES ET COMPOSITIONS DESTINEES A TRAITER LE CANCER | [2007/47] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 19.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/28] | 07.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2011 | 31.03.2012 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   21.08.2012 | 31.03.2013 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   03.09.2013 | 31.03.2014 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2014 | 31.03.2016 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004080486 ; | [X]DE3638124 (NATTERMANN A & CIE [DE]) [X] 1-4,9,11,12 * column 1, line 1 - line 7 *; | [X]WO9202221 (RHONE POULENC RORER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,9-11,13,14,17-23 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 5, paragraph 1 * * claims 1-6 *; | [X]US2003157191 (KIL JONATHAN [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13-23 * page 1, paragraphs 2,5,13 * * page 2, paragraphs 16,18,19 * * page 5, paragraphs 55,57 * * page 6, paragraphs 62,65 * * page 6; examples 2,3 * * claims 3,9 *; | [X] - BALDEW G S ET AL, "SELECTIVE REDUCTION OF CIS DIAMMINEDICHLOROPLATINUM-II NEPHROTOXICITY BY EBSELEN", CANCER RESEARCH, (1990), vol. 50, no. 21, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 7031 - 7036, XP002555213 [X] 1-4,11-13,18-23 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 68, Database accession no. 2004-699386, XP002555214 & WO2004080486 A 20040923 (null) [A] 5-12,15-23 * abstract * | International search | [X]WO03045334 (SOUND PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [Y] - KERN D.H., "Heterogeneity of drug resistance in human breast and ovarian cancers", CANCER JOURNAL FROM SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, (199801), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 41 - 45, XP008123189 |