EP1861788 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR A LOCATION-BASED UNIFORM RESOURCE LOCATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telcordia Technologies, Inc. One Telcordia Drive 5G116 Piscataway, NJ 08854-4157 / US | For all designated states Toyota InfoTechnology Center, U.S.A. Inc. 4009 Miranda Avenue, Suite 200 Palo Alto, CA 94304-1218 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states Telcordia Technologies, Inc. One Telcordia Drive 5G116 Piscataway, NJ 08854-4157 / US | ||
For all designated states Toyota Infotechnology Center U.S.A. Inc. 4009 Miranda Avenue, Suite 200 Palo Alto, CA 94304-1218 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LING, Yibei 901 Rhoads Drive Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Wai 5 Jagged Rock Road Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | 03 /
ALTINTAS, Onur 3-22-11-1009 Kamiasao,Asao-ku Kawasaki 215-0021 / JP | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Round, Edward Mark Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | Round, Edward Mark Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06737687.1 | 09.03.2006 | [2007/49] | WO2006US08531 | Priority number, date | US20050075492 | 09.03.2005 Original published format: US 75492 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006096824 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1861788 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
H04W4/02 (EP);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
H04L67/55 (US);
H04L61/30 (EP,US);
H04L61/4541 (EP,US);
H04L65/40 (KR);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/1001 (EP,US);
H04L67/1021 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04L67/563 (EP,US);
H04L67/60 (US);
|
Former IPC [2008/09] | G06F15/173 | ||
Former IPC [2007/49] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM FÜR EINE STANDORTBASIERTE INTERNETADRESSE | [2007/49] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR A LOCATION-BASED UNIFORM RESOURCE LOCATOR | [2007/49] | French: | PROCEDE, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTEME POUR ADRESSE URL BASEE SUR LA LOCALISATION | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 20.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/12] | 03.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO0114990 (WEBEVER INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 30 * * page 3, line 16 - page 7, line 30; figures 2-5 * * page 10, lines 16-29 * * claim 1 * [A] 8-15; | [XA]EP1381197 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [X] 8-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] * * paragraphs [0007] - [0020] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0028]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0052] *[A] 1-7; | [X]US6724733 (SCHUBA CHRISTOPH [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 1, lines 12-19, 42-59 * * column 5, lines 32-41, 55-60 * * column 8, line 47 - column 9, line 22 * * column 10, lines 38-40 *; | [XA]US6760775 (ANEROUSIS NIKOLAOS [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 1, lines 52-62 * * column 3, lines 58-65 * * column 4, lines 15-34 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 12 * * column 8, line 7 - column 9, line 17; figure 3 * [A] 8-15; | [X] - SUBBIAH B ET AL, "Content Aware Networking in the Internet: Issues and Challenges", ICC 2001. 2001 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS. CONFERENCE RECORD. HELSINKI, FINLAND, JUNE 11 - 14, 2001; NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20010611), vol. 4, doi:10.1109/ICC.2001.936912, ISBN 978-0-7803-7097-5, pages 1310 - 1315, XP010553538 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * sections 5., 6. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.2001.936912 | International search | [X]US2001039210 (ST-DENIS DANNY [CA]); | [Y]US2002112036 (BOHANNON THOMAS A [US], et al) |