EP1861735 - POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION COMPRISING LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT ORGANIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Clinton L. 3m Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
GOENNER, Emily S. 3m Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
OLSON, David B. 3m Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
KOLB, Brant U. 3m Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/11] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/50] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Europe S.A./N.V. OIPC Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2007/49] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Europe S.A., Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 06738109.5 | 10.03.2006 | [2007/49] | WO2006US09007 | Priority number, date | US20050077598 | 11.03.2005 Original published format: US 77598 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006099357 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1861735 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1861735 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/04 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/18 (KR);
G02B1/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/00 (KR);
C09K2323/00 (EP,US);
C09K2323/035 (EP,US);
G02B6/0053 (EP,US);
G02B6/0065 (EP,US);
G02F1/133507 (EP,US);
Y10S977/84 (EP,US);
Y10S977/932 (EP,US);
Y10S977/939 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US);
Y10T428/257 (EP,US);
Y10T428/258 (EP,US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
G02B1/04, C08L33/08 (EP,US);
G02B1/04, C08L33/10 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMERISIERBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT ORGANISCHEM BESTANDTEIL VON NIEDRIGEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT | [2007/49] | English: | POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION COMPRISING LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT ORGANIC COMPONENT | [2007/49] | French: | COMPOSITION POLYMERISABLE COMPRENANT UN CONSTITUANT ORGANIQUE DE FAIBLE POIDS MOLECULAIRE | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 29.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10171624.9 / EP2256524 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2006 | AT | 11.05.2011 | BE | 11.05.2011 | CY | 11.05.2011 | CZ | 11.05.2011 | DK | 11.05.2011 | EE | 11.05.2011 | FI | 11.05.2011 | IT | 11.05.2011 | LT | 11.05.2011 | LV | 11.05.2011 | NL | 11.05.2011 | PL | 11.05.2011 | RO | 11.05.2011 | SE | 11.05.2011 | SI | 11.05.2011 | SK | 11.05.2011 | TR | 11.05.2011 | BG | 11.08.2011 | GR | 12.08.2011 | ES | 22.08.2011 | IS | 11.09.2011 | PT | 12.09.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
TR | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 11.05.2011 | |
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 11.05.2011 | |
PT | 12.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6114010 (WILLIAMS TODD R [US]) [A] 1,20,27; | [A]US2002057497 (GARDINER MARK E [US], et al) [A] 24-26* paragraph [0042]; claim 1 *; | [YX]WO2004074884 (MICROSHARP CORP LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-6,10,12,14-16,21,22 * page 3, paragraph 5; claim 1 * * page 1, paragraph 4; figure 1; claim 21 * [X] 27-30; | [Y]US2004233526 (KAMINSKY CHERYL J [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,10,12,14-16,21,22 * paragraph [0008]; example -; claim 2 * | by applicant | US5175030 | US5183597 | US5908874 | US5932626 | EP1014113 | US6107364 | US6280063 | US6355754 | WO03076528 | US20040938006 |