EP1861868 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING PLASMA CONDITIONS IN AN ETCHING PLASMA PROCESSING FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY MATERIALS, INC. 7 Commerce Drive Danbury, CT 06810-4169 / US | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Ing-Shin 6 Sleepy Hollow Drive Danbury, CT 06810 / US | 02 /
NEUNER, Jeffrey, W. 141 Old Hawleyville Road Bethel, CT 06801 / US | 03 /
DIMEO, Frank, Jr. 1809 Gilson Street Falls Church, VA 22043-1129 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Philip, S.H. 26 Budd Drive Bethel, CT 06801 / US | 05 /
WELCH, James 45 Sandy Lane Wolcott, CT 06716 / US | 06 /
ROEDER, Jeffrey, F. 4 Longmeadow Hill Road Brookfield, CT 06804 / US | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2007/49] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D 4th floor Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 06738395.0 | 15.03.2006 | [2007/49] | WO2006US09330 | Priority number, date | US20050081439 | 16.03.2005 Original published format: US 81439 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006101897 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1861868 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/302 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
B81C1/00587 (EP,US);
H01L22/00 (KR);
B81C99/0065 (EP,US);
C23C16/4405 (EP,US);
H01J37/32935 (EP,US);
H01L21/3065 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2007/49] | H01L21/302, G01L21/30, C23F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES PLASMAZUSTANDES IN EINER PLASMA-ÄTZBEARBEITUNGSANLAGE | [2007/49] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING PLASMA CONDITIONS IN AN ETCHING PLASMA PROCESSING FACILITY | [2007/49] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DES CONDITIONS PLASMATIQUES DANS UNE INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT POUR GRAVURE AU PLASMA | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 13.08.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.05.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1798977 (ERICKSON ALBERT N) [X] 1,3-5,10-14,16 * figure 5 *; | [X]GB636647 (RALPH POOLE) [X] 1-5,10-14,16 * figure 2 *; | [X]US3522010 (ARCHER LEE A) [X] 1,3-5,10-14,16 * figures 1-3 *; | [XP]WO2005072161 (ADVANCED TECH MATERIALS [US], et al) [XP] 1,3-18 * figures 9A,9B *; | [XP]WO2005081931 (ADVANCED TECH MATERIALS [US], et al) [XP] 1,3,4,6-18 * figures 10,11 *; | [XP] - CHEN ING-SHIN ET AL, "Application of a downstream calorimetric probe to reactive plasma", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1063/1.2140088, (20051201), vol. 87, no. 23, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 231501 - 231501, XP012076724 [XP] 1,3-18 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2140088 | International search | [X]US5885361 (KIKUCHI JUN [JP], et al) |