EP1869872 - SYSTEM FOR EFFECTING A TELEPHONE CALL OVER A COMPUTER NETWORK WITHOUT ALPHANUMERIC KEYPAD OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/52] | A SYSTEM FOR EFFECTING A TELEPHONE CALL OVER A COMPUTER NETWORK WITHOUT ALPHANUMERIC KEYPAD OPERATION | ||
[2015/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vonage Business Inc. 3200 Windy Hill Road Suites 200, 400, 500 & 750 East Atlanta, GA 30339 / US | [2016/28] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states Vonage Network LLC 23 Main Street Holmdel, NJ 07733 / US | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Vonage Network, Inc. 23 Main Street Holmdel, NJ 07733 / US | ||
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states Vonage Networks Inc. 23 Main Street Holmdel NJ 07733 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAH, Nilesh 23 Main Street Holmdel, New Jersey 07733 / US | 02 /
WASON, Andrew 6 Victorian Woods Drive Atlantic Highlands, New Jersey 07716 / US | 03 /
CITRON, Jeffrey 1715 North Umberland Way Monmouth Junction, New Jersey 08852 / US | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/28] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2007/52] | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06738502.1 | 16.03.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006US09450 | Priority number, date | US20050081174 | 16.03.2005 Original published format: US 81174 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006101949 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1869872 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1869872 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04M7/00 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
H04M7/0027 (EP,US);
H04M11/06 (US);
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/1104 (EP,US);
H04M7/003 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/21] | H04M3/42, H04M3/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/16] | H04M11/00, H04M3/42, H04M3/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/52] | H04M11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/28] |
Former [2007/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES TELEFONRUFS ÜBER EIN COMPUTERNETZWERK OHNE VERWENDUNG EINER ALPHANUMERISCHEN TASTATUR | [2007/52] | English: | SYSTEM FOR EFFECTING A TELEPHONE CALL OVER A COMPUTER NETWORK WITHOUT ALPHANUMERIC KEYPAD OPERATION | [2015/46] | French: | SYSTEME D'ETABLISSEMENT D'UNE COMMUNICATION TELEPHONIQUE DANS UN RESEAU D'ORDINATEURS SANS UTILISATION D'UN CLAVIER ALPHANUMERIQUE | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/52] | A SYSTEM FOR EFFECTING A TELEPHONE CALL OVER A COMPUTER NETWORK WITHOUT ALPHANUMERIC KEYPAD OPERATION | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 08.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2006 | AT | 13.07.2016 | BE | 13.07.2016 | CY | 13.07.2016 | CZ | 13.07.2016 | DK | 13.07.2016 | EE | 13.07.2016 | ES | 13.07.2016 | FI | 13.07.2016 | IT | 13.07.2016 | LT | 13.07.2016 | LV | 13.07.2016 | MC | 13.07.2016 | NL | 13.07.2016 | PL | 13.07.2016 | RO | 13.07.2016 | SE | 13.07.2016 | SI | 13.07.2016 | SK | 13.07.2016 | TR | 13.07.2016 | BG | 13.10.2016 | GR | 14.10.2016 | IS | 13.11.2016 | PT | 14.11.2016 | GB | 16.03.2017 | IE | 16.03.2017 | LU | 16.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | FR | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 16.03.2006 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
GB | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.03.2006 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
GB | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
GB | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
LU | 16.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 13.07.2016 | |
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US6091808 (WOOD TIMOTHY JOHN [CA], et al); | [Y]US7177415 (KIM KI-YOUNG [KR], et al) | Examination | - ROSENBERG DYNAMICSOFT J PETERSON NEUSTAR H SCHULZRINNE COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY G CAMARILLO ERICSSON J, "Best Current Practices for Third Party Call Control (3pcc) in the Session Initiation Protocol (SIP); rfc3725.txt", IETF, (20040401), ISSN 0000-0003, pages 1 - 32, XP015009505 | by applicant | US6091808 | US7177415 |