EP1864280 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PHASE MATCHING FRAMES IN VOCODERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2007/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPOOR, Rohit 10335 Caminito Alvarez San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 02 /
SPINDOLA, Serafin Diaz 12503 Kestrel Street San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/50] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06738529.4 | 13.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006US09477 | Priority number, date | US20050660824P | 11.03.2005 Original published format: US 660824 P | US20050662736P | 16.03.2005 Original published format: US 662736 P | US20050192231 | 27.07.2005 Original published format: US 192231 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006099534 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1864280 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
G10L19/005 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PHASENANPASSUNG VON RAHMEN IN VOCODERN | [2007/50] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PHASE MATCHING FRAMES IN VOCODERS | [2007/50] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR TRAMES D'APPARIEMENT DE PHASES DES VOCODEURS | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.12.2018 | 08.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/13] | 18.11.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/13] | 13.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US2004204935 (ANANDAKUMAR KRISHNASAMY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,12,23,24,26,29,30,34,45,46,48,51,52,56 * paragraphs [0001] - [0009] - [0013] , [0017] , [0024] , [0025] , [0035] - [0048]; figure 1 * [A] 5,10,15-19,27,32,37-41,49,54,59-63 [Y] 3,6,9,11,13,14,20-22,25,28,31,33,35,36,42-44,47,50,53,55,57,58,64-66; | [Y]US2004156397 (HEIKKINEN ARI [FI], et al) [Y] 3,6,9,11,13,14,20-22,25,28,31,33,35,36,42-44,47,50,53,55,57,58,64-66 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0010] , [0014] , [0016] , [0056] , [0060] - [0065]; figures 5,6 *; | [PX]EP1536582 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [PX] 1,2,4,8,23,24,26,30,45,46,48,52 * paragraph [0030] * |