EP1864480 - IN-FIELD UPGRADE MANAGMENT OF DATA CAPTURE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, Inc. One Symbol Plaza, Mail Stop A6 Holtsville, NY 11742-1300 / US | [2007/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANG, Robert, James 580 Concord Avenue Williston Park, New York 11596 / US | 02 /
BIANCULLI, Thomas, D. 63 Beechwood Drive Manorville, NY 11949 / US | 03 /
MAY, Robert 107 Macon Avenue Sayville, NY 11782 / US | 04 /
FJELLSTAD, Christopher, James 19 Burlington Boulevard Smithtown, NY 11787 / US | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Pitchford, James Edward, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | Pitchford, James Edward, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06738655.7 | 10.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006US09621 | Priority number, date | US20050095176 | 31.03.2005 Original published format: US 95176 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006104717 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1864480 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04M9/00 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
G07G1/14 (EP,US);
G06K2207/1017 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/14] |
Former [2007/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTUALISIERUNGSVERWALTUNG VON DATENERFASSUNGSSYSTEMEN IM FELD | [2007/50] | English: | IN-FIELD UPGRADE MANAGMENT OF DATA CAPTURE SYSTEMS | [2007/50] | French: | GESTION DE MISE A NIVEAU IN SITU DE SYSTEMES DE CAPTURE DE DONNEES | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 04.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.11.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/35] | 13.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5457307 (DUMONT CHARLES [AG]) [X] 1-16 * column 2, line 29 - column 4, line 37 * * column 8, line 59 - column 9, line 6 * * figure 8; claim 1 *; | [A]US5848064 (COWAN PAUL A [US]) [A] 7,8,15,16 * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 27 * * column 7, line 12 - column 8, line 65 * * column 12, line 20 - column 14, line 9 *; | [A]EP1062573 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 7,8,15,16 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0028] ** paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0056] *; | [X]US2004251307 (SCHMIDT MARK [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0635] * | International search | [X]US5457307 (DUMONT CHARLES [AG]); | [Y]US2002055355 (IKEDA MASAHISA [JP]); | [YE]US2007080220 (GARVER ROYAL A [US]) |