EP1948613 - PROCESS FOT THE PREPARATION OF ULTRAPURE 4-METHYLPYRAZOLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paladin Labs (Barbados) Inc. Worthing Main Road Christ Church 15008 / BB | [2009/36] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Orphan Medical, Inc. 3180 Porter Drive Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REARDAN, Dayton, T. 22345 Bracketts Road Shorewood, MN 55331 / US | 02 /
COMBE, Michel, D. 7405 N. Seneca Road Fox Point, WI 53217 / US | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Michalík, Andrej, et al De Clercq & Partners cvba E. Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2010/33] |
Former [2010/03] | Jacobs, Philippe, et al De Clercq Brants & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Fagerlin, Heléne, et al Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 06738956.9 | 20.03.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006US09979 | Priority number, date | US20050776009P | 21.04.2005 Original published format: US 776009 P | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006115626 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1948613 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/12 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ULTRAREINEM 4-METHYLPYRAZOL | [2008/31] | English: | PROCESS FOT THE PREPARATION OF ULTRAPURE 4-METHYLPYRAZOLE | [2008/31] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA PREPARATION DE LA 4-METHYLPYRAZOLE ULTRAPURE | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/10] | 22.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXA]US6229022 (MERKLE HANS RUPERT [DE], et al) [DX] 1-3 * column 3, line 30 - line 55 * * column 3, line 30 - line 55 * [A] 4-15 [X] 1-3; | [DXA]US5569769 (MERKLE HANS R [DE], et al) [DX] 1-3 * example 1 * * example 1 * [A] 4-15 [X] 1-3; | [XA]EP0366328 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,1-3 * examples 5-7; claim 1 * * examples 5-7; claim 1 * [A] 4-15 | by applicant | US3200128 | US4996327 | US5569769 | US6229022 | EP0366328 | - T. LI ET AL., ACTA CHEM. SCAN., (1969), vol. 23, pages 892 - 902 | - E. MACDONALD, ACTA PHARMACOL. ET TOXICOL., (1976), vol. 39, pages 513 - 524 | - H. KOHNO ET AL., CANCER SCI., (2005), vol. 96, pages 69 - 76 |