EP1866657 - OPTIMIZED JTAG INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474 Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75265-5474 / US | [2012/14] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474, Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHETSEL, Lee D. 5804 Rathbone Dr. Parker, Texas 75002 / US | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patent Department 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK91AQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/25] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [2007/51] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department Northampton Business Park Northampton, Northamptonshire NN4 7YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 06739076.5 | 21.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006US10144 | Priority number, date | US20050663953P | 21.03.2005 Original published format: US 663953 P | US20060370017 | 07.03.2006 Original published format: US 370017 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006102284 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1866657 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1866657 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/3185, G06F11/36 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
G01R31/318572 (EP,US);
G01R31/3177 (US);
G01R31/3172 (US);
G01R31/31723 (US);
G01R31/31724 (US);
G01R31/31727 (US);
G01R31/318541 (US);
G01R31/318555 (EP,US);
G01R31/318558 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/46] | G06F11/00, G01R31/3185 | ||
Former IPC [2009/30] | G06F11/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/51] | G01R31/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/48] |
Former [2008/26] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OPTIMIERTE JTAG-SCHNITTSTELLE | [2007/51] | English: | OPTIMIZED JTAG INTERFACE | [2007/51] | French: | INTERFACE JTAG OPTIMISEE | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 29.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 09.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0840219 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [GB]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 44 - column 7, line 55 ** column 8, line 33 - column 18, line 11 *; | [X]US2001050575 (WENG CHIH-HSIEN [TW], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0041] *; | [X]US2002120895 (SUZUKI MASAHITO [JP]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0077] *; | [E]WO2006083856 (FORMFACTOR INC [US], et al) [E] 1-10 * abstract * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 33 * * page 10, line 20 - page 12, line 14 * | International search | [A]US5056093 (WHETSEL LEE D [US]); | [Y]US5828825 (ESKANDARI NICK G [US], et al); | [Y]US2002049928 (WHETSEL LEE D [US], et al) |