EP1868908 - ONE WAY VALVE AND CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTI INDUSTRIES CORPORATION 22160 N. Pepper Road Barrington, IL 60010 / US | [2007/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Brent 26072 Indian Trail Barrington, IL 60010 / US | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Dee, Ian Mark Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Dee, Ian Mark Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06739866.9 | 29.03.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006US11352 | Priority number, date | US20050092384 | 29.03.2005 Original published format: US 92384 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006105132 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1868908 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1868908 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65D35/28 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
B65D81/2023 (EP,US);
B65D33/2508 (EP,US);
B65D77/225 (EP,US);
B65D81/2038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINWEGEVENTIL UND BEHÄLTER | [2007/52] | English: | ONE WAY VALVE AND CONTAINER | [2007/52] | French: | CLAPET ANTI-RETOUR ET CONTENANT | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 20.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2006 | AT | 06.07.2011 | BE | 06.07.2011 | CY | 06.07.2011 | CZ | 06.07.2011 | DK | 06.07.2011 | EE | 06.07.2011 | FI | 06.07.2011 | IT | 06.07.2011 | LT | 06.07.2011 | LV | 06.07.2011 | NL | 06.07.2011 | PL | 06.07.2011 | RO | 06.07.2011 | SE | 06.07.2011 | SI | 06.07.2011 | SK | 06.07.2011 | TR | 06.07.2011 | BG | 06.10.2011 | GR | 07.10.2011 | ES | 17.10.2011 | IS | 06.11.2011 | PT | 07.11.2011 | IE | 29.03.2012 | LU | 29.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
TR | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
IE | 29.03.2012 | ||
LU | 29.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
TR | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
IE | 29.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
IE | 29.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
IE | 29.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
IE | 29.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | BE | 06.07.2011 | |
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | BE | 06.07.2011 | |
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 06.07.2011 | |
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | SI | 06.07.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]US2006131328 (ANDERSON BRENT [US]) [E] 1-29* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2778173 (GERALD TAUNTON); | [Y]US3949934 (GOGLIO LUIGI); | [Y]US4756422 (KRISTEN HANNS J [US]); | [Y]US5450963 (CARSON JAMES A [US]); | [Y]JPH09131846 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]US5701996 (GOTO SHUICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2002117215 (SKEENS JANET L [US], et al); | [Y]US6604634 (SU FU-LONG [TW]); | [Y]EP1431211 (SALDOPLAST S R L [IT]) |