EP1866603 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INDICATING REMINDERS VIA A PORTABLE COMPUTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROGERS, Sean, Scott 12510 Heatherton Court, Unit 196 San Diego, California 92128 / US | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Gates, Marie Christina Esther Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 06740249.5 | 30.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006US12033 | Priority number, date | US20050096892 | 31.03.2005 Original published format: US 96892 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006105431 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1866603 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/00 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
G06Q10/109 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/72457 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/72451 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/02 (EP,KR);
H04W4/029 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANZEIGEN VON GEDÄCHTNISHILFEN ÜBER EIN TRAGBARES DATENVERARBEITUNGSGERÄT | [2007/51] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INDICATING REMINDERS VIA A PORTABLE COMPUTING DEVICE | [2007/51] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR FOURNIR DES RAPPELS VIA UN DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE PORTABLE | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6177905 (WELCH BRYAN J [US]); | [AP]US6941127 (MURAMATSU TOSHIHIKO [JP]); | [YP]US6957076 (HUNZINGER JASON F [US]) |