EP1879694 - METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING SUPPORTED NANOCATALYSTS AND METHODS FOR USING SUPPORTED NANOCATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | Change - PCT data | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Headwaters Technology Innovation LLC 1501 New York Avenue Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | [2008/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REYES, Clementine 180 Franklin Corner Road, Apt C12 Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | 02 /
PARASHER, Sukesh 423 Lawrenceville Road 215 Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | 03 /
ZHOU, Bing 2 Falcon Ct. Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06740774.2 | 10.04.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006US13227 | Priority number, date | US20050126963 | 10.05.2005 Original published format: US 126963 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006121553 | Date: | 16.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1879694 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01J21/18, B01J31/00, B01J29/04, B01J21/16 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
B01J23/44 (EP,US);
B01J37/0203 (EP,US);
B01J37/0207 (EP,US);
B01J37/0211 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG GETRÄGERTER NANOKATALYSATOREN | [2008/04] | English: | METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING SUPPORTED NANOCATALYSTS AND METHODS FOR USING SUPPORTED NANOCATALYSTS | [2008/04] | French: | PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DE NANOCATALYSEURS SUPPORTES ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 13.03.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6709824 (JACOBSON ET AL) |