EP1921798 - A METHOD FOR TESTING THE SERVICE PERFORMANCE OF THE FILE TRANSFER PROTOCOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Hongfei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518219 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Jian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518219 / CN | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06741924.2 | 19.05.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006CN01036 | Priority number, date | CN2005136978 | 31.08.2005 Original published format: CN200510036978 | [2008/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007025425 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1921798 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04L29/08, // H04L29/06 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
H04L41/5096 (EP,US);
H04L41/5009 (EP,US);
H04L43/18 (EP,US);
H04L43/50 (EP,US);
H04L63/083 (EP,US);
H04L43/0829 (EP,US);
H04L43/0852 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/20] | H04L12/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM PRÜFEN DER DIENSTLEISTUNGSFÄHIGKEIT DES DATEITRANSFERPROTOKOLLS | [2008/20] | English: | A METHOD FOR TESTING THE SERVICE PERFORMANCE OF THE FILE TRANSFER PROTOCOL | [2008/20] | French: | METHODE DE TEST DE L'EFFICACITE DU PROTOCOLE DE TRANSFERT DE FICHIER | [2008/20] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2008 | Translation filed | 11.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/29] | 30.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/30] | 17.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - COTANIS N ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "QoS estimation for cellular packet data networks", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2003. VTC 2003-FALL. 2003 IEEE 58TH ORLANDO, FL, USA 6-9 OCT. 2003; [IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE], PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20031006), vol. 3, ISBN 978-0-7803-7954-1, pages 1623 - 1627, XP010702660 [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [000I] * * paragraph [0III] * * paragraph [0V.B] * * figure 2; table II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2003.1285299 | [A] - KUROSE J F; ROSS K W, Computer Networking. A Top-Down Approach Featuring the Internet, passage, ADDISON WESLEY, (2001), XP002497831 [A] 1-12 * page 104 - page 106 * | [A] - POSTEL J REYNOLDS ISI J, "FILE TRANSFER PROTOCOL (FTP); rfc959.txt", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (19851001), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015006955 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [02.2] - [02.3] * * paragraph [03.2] * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] * * paragraph [0008] * | [A] - ALLMAN NASA LEWIS/STERLING SOFTWARE S OSTERMANN OHIO UNIVERSITY C METZ THE INNER NET M, "FTP Extensions for IPv6 and NATs; rfc2428.txt", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (19980901), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015008212 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * | International search | [X]US2004071095 (RAISANEN VILHO [FI]); | [A]US5627766 (BEAVEN PAUL A [GB]); | [A]WO2005036813 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]) |