EP1896755 - A CONTROL VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2016 | Petition for review: decision | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRESE A/S Sorovej 8 4200 Slagelse / DK | [2008/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JO̸RGENSEN, Ole c/o Frese A/S, Soro̸vej 8 4200 Slagelse / DK | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Trier, Mikkel Roed, et al Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | Trier, Mikkel Roed, et al Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2008/11] | Larsen, Hans Ole, et al Larsen & Birkeholm A/S Skandinavisk Patentbureau Banegaardspladsen 1 P.O. Box 362 1570 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 06742464.8 | 14.06.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006DK00338 | Priority number, date | DK20050000920 | 23.06.2005 Original published format: DK 200500920 | [2008/11] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006136158 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | DA | [2006/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1896755 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1896755 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16K5/10, F16K3/32, G05D23/02, G05D23/12 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
F24D19/1015 (EP,US);
G05D16/028 (EP,US);
G05D16/0658 (EP,US);
Y10T137/3096 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86919 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/11] | Extension states | RS | 23.01.2008 | Title | German: | STEUERVENTIL | [2008/11] | English: | A CONTROL VALVE | [2008/11] | French: | VANNE DE REGULATION | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2006 | Translation filed | 23.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 15.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2010
08.12.2010
ADMISSIBLE FlowCon International A/S Trafikcenter Allé 17 4200 Slagelse / DK Opponent's representative Nordic Patent Service A/S Bredgade 30 1260 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2010
08.12.2010
ADMISSIBLE FlowCon International A/S Trafikcenter Allé 17 4200 Slagelse / DK Opponent's representative Nordic Patent Service A/S Ho̸jbro Plads 10 1200 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2012/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2010
08.12.2010
ADMISSIBLE FlowCon International A/S Trafikcenter Allé 17 4200 Slagelse / DK Opponent's representative Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2010/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2010
FlowCon International A/S Trafikcenter Allé 17 4200 Slagelse / DK Opponent's representative Wittrup, Flemming Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | 12.01.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.04.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.03.2012 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/32] | 13.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.06.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.06.2012 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 18.02.2014 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/33] | Appeal following opposition | 31.07.2012 | Appeal received No. T1767/12 | 04.10.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.02.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 18.02.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.02.2014 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Petition(s) for review: | 07.07.2014 | Petition for review received | Number: R0011/14 | for appeal No. T1767/12-3205 | Petitioner: OP01 | 23.09.2016 | Decision: Petition for review obviously unsubstantiated only. | 23.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.02.2010 | BE | 24.02.2010 | CY | 24.02.2010 | CZ | 24.02.2010 | DK | 24.02.2010 | EE | 24.02.2010 | FI | 24.02.2010 | LT | 24.02.2010 | LV | 24.02.2010 | PL | 24.02.2010 | RO | 24.02.2010 | SE | 24.02.2010 | SI | 24.02.2010 | SK | 24.02.2010 | BG | 24.05.2010 | GR | 25.05.2010 | IE | 14.06.2010 | LU | 14.06.2010 | IS | 24.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | HU | 25.08.2010 | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/19] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
IE | 14.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]BE370472 (HIBY A) [A] 1,1,1 * page 4 - page 7; figure - * * page 4 - page 7; figure - * * page 4 - page 7; figure - *; | [A]GB168220 (COMBUSTION ENG CORP) [A] 1,2,1,2,1,2 * page 1, line 79 - page 2, line 43; figure - * * page 1, line 79 - page 2, line 43; figure - ** page 1, line 79 - page 2, line 43; figure - *; | [A]GB948738 (FILIP EMANUEL ODELL, et al) [A] 1,1,1 * page 1, line 49 - page 2, line 29; figure - * * page 1, line 49 - page 2, line 29; figure - * * page 1, line 49 - page 2, line 29; figure - *; | [A]US4702279 (GIESE JOHN D [US]) [A] 1,1,1 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 3; figure - * * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 3; figure - * * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 3; figure - *; | [A]US5860591 (GYLOV HANS HENRIK [DK], et al) [A] 1,1,1 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract *; | [A]DE10256035 (DANFOSS AS [DK]) [A] 1,1,1 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract * |