EP1877278 - AIRBAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB Wallentinsvägen 22 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB 44783 Vargarda / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAYLOR, Ian 5 Sunnyside Malpas Cheshire, SY14 7AA / GB | 02 /
JACOBSSON, Börje Kållgatan 4B 507 31 Bråumhult / SE | 03 /
HENRIKSSON, Ola Västergatan 7 44733 Vargarda / SE | 04 /
HAGMAN, Anders Pers Lid 8 445 55 Surte / SE | 05 /
LINDSAY, Martin 4, Motcombe Road, Heald Green Cheadle, Cheshire SK8 3TP / GB | 06 /
BRADBURN, Alan 23 The Moat, Weston Coyney Stoke onTrent, Staffordshire ST3 6NB / GB | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Schön, Thilo, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Thilo Schön Grünstraße 1 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | Schön, Thilo, et al Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A D-75173 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 06742713.8 | 27.04.2006 | [2008/03] | WO2006EP03892 | Priority number, date | DE20051021371 | 04.05.2005 Original published format: DE102005021371 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006117121 | Date: | 09.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1877278 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1877278 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/00 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
B60R21/231 (EP,US);
B60R21/23 (KR);
B60R21/20 (KR);
B60R21/21 (KR);
B60R21/213 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AIRBAG | [2008/03] | English: | AIRBAG | [2008/03] | French: | AIRBAG | [2008/03] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 03.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.02.2010 | BE | 17.02.2010 | CY | 17.02.2010 | CZ | 17.02.2010 | DK | 17.02.2010 | EE | 17.02.2010 | FI | 17.02.2010 | IT | 17.02.2010 | LT | 17.02.2010 | LV | 17.02.2010 | NL | 17.02.2010 | PL | 17.02.2010 | RO | 17.02.2010 | SE | 17.02.2010 | SI | 17.02.2010 | SK | 17.02.2010 | TR | 17.02.2010 | IE | 27.04.2010 | LU | 27.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | BG | 17.05.2010 | GR | 18.05.2010 | ES | 28.05.2010 | IS | 17.06.2010 | PT | 17.06.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 27.04.2010 | ||
LU | 27.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 27.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 27.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 27.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
BE | 17.02.2010 | ||
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | ES | 28.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO02079008 (TRW REPA GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1-15* page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 4; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1369317 (TAKATA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032]; figures 8,9 *; | [A]US2004104561 (MAERTENS PAUL G [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014]; figures 1,3 *; | [X] - ANONYMOUS, "Fabric diffuser panel for air bag module", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (200012), vol. 440, no. 115, ISSN 0374-4353, XP007127300 [X] 1-5,10,11,15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005]; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO02079008 |