EP1880035 - METHOD FOR COATING A SUBSTRATE SURFACE AND COATED PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Höganäs Germany GmbH Im Schleeke 78-91 38642 Goslar / DE | [2020/26] |
Former [2018/22] | For all designated states H.C. Starck Surface Technology and Ceramic Powders GmbH Landsberger Strasse 98 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states H.C. Starck GmbH Im Schleeke 78-91 38642 Goslar / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states Bayer Beteiligungsverwaltung Goslar GmbH Im Schleeke 78-91 38642 Goslar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIMMERMANN, Stefan Schweizerblick 27 79725 Laufenburg / DE | 02 /
PAPP, Uwe Steinkampring 42 38667 Bad Harzburg / DE | 03 /
KREYE, Heinrich Werfelring 51 22175 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
SCHMIDT, Tobias Isingheim 4 59889 Eslohe / DE | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Blurock, Maryna Höganäs AB IP department Bruksgatan 35 263 83 Höganäs / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/03] | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/12] | Ambor, Volker H.C. Starck GmbH Law, Patents & Insurances Im Schleeke 78-91 38642 Goslar / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | Clauswitz, Kai-Uwe Wolfram H.C. Starck GmbH Patentabteilung Im Schleeke 78-91 38642 Goslar / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | Clauswitz, Kai-Uwe Wolfram H.C. Starck GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Im Schleeke 78-91 D-38642 Goslar / DE | Application number, filing date | 06742726.0 | 28.04.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006EP03967 | Priority number, date | US20050678057P | 05.05.2005 Original published format: US 678057 P | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006117144 | Date: | 09.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1880035 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1880035 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/06, C23C24/04, C23C4/137 | [2018/45] | CPC: |
C23C24/04 (EP,KR,US);
C23C4/12 (KR);
C22C14/00 (US);
C22C27/02 (US);
C22C27/04 (US);
C22C30/00 (US);
C23C4/06 (EP,KR,US);
C23C4/137 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12014 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/04] | C23C4/12, C23C4/06, C23C24/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/03] |
Former [2008/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG DER OBERFLÄCHE EINES SUSTRATS UND BESCHICHTETER ARTIKEL | [2018/45] | English: | METHOD FOR COATING A SUBSTRATE SURFACE AND COATED PRODUCT | [2008/04] | French: | PROCEDE DE REVETEMENT D'UNE SURFACE DE SUBSTRAT ET PRODUIT MUNI DU REVETEMENT | [2008/04] |
Former [2008/04] | VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHICHTEN EINER SUBSTRATOBERFLÄCHE UND BESCHICHTETES PRODUKT | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 03.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2006 | AT | 20.01.2021 | CY | 20.01.2021 | CZ | 20.01.2021 | DK | 20.01.2021 | EE | 20.01.2021 | ES | 20.01.2021 | LT | 20.01.2021 | LV | 20.01.2021 | MC | 20.01.2021 | NL | 20.01.2021 | PL | 20.01.2021 | RO | 20.01.2021 | SE | 20.01.2021 | SI | 20.01.2021 | SK | 20.01.2021 | TR | 20.01.2021 | BG | 20.04.2021 | GR | 21.04.2021 | IE | 28.04.2021 | LU | 28.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | IS | 20.05.2021 | PT | 20.05.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 28.04.2006 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | LT | 20.01.2021 | |
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | LT | 20.01.2021 | |
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | LT | 20.01.2021 | |
PT | 20.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0484533 (INST TEORETICHESKOI I PRIKLADN [SU]) [DX] 1-30 * page 5, line 6 - line 45 * * page 8, line 22 - line 36 * * example 7; table 3 * * claims 1-8 *; | [A]US5242481 (KUMAR PRABHAT [US]) [A] 1-30 * column 2, line 35 - column 4, line 53 * * examples 1,8 ** claims 1,5,6 *; | [X]US5795626 (GABEL HOWARD [US], et al) [X] 1,19,24,27,30 * column 1, line 9 - line 30 * * column 3, line 15 - line 26 * * column 15, line 55 - column 16, line 49 * * figures 1-4; claims 1,27,28 *; | [YA]US6261337 (KUMAR PRABHAT [US]) [Y] 25,26 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 17 * * column 7, line 47 - line 55 * * claims 1-5 * [A] 1-24,27-30; | [X]US2003190413 (VAN STEENKISTE THOMAS HUBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,19,24,27,30 * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 2, paragraph 13 * * page 3, paragraph 16 - paragraph 17 * * page 4, paragraph 22 * * claims 1,6,7,9,11,14,18,19,26 *; | [X]US2003219542 (EWASYSHYN FRANK J [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * page 1, paragraph 10 * * page 2, paragraph 24 - page 3, paragraph 33 * * table 1 * * claims 1,2,5,12 *; | [YA]US2003232132 (MUEHLBERGER ERICH [US]) [Y] 25,26 * page 1, paragraph 4 - paragraph 12 * * page 2, paragraphs 17,18,25 * * page 4, paragraph 41 - page 5, paragraph 44 * * claims 1-12,14,18 * [A] 1-24,27-30 | by applicant | EP0484533 | US5795626 | US6261337 | US2003190413 | US2003219542 | DE10253794 |