EP1879771 - ELEMENT FOR SOUND INSULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Automotive Components Group GmbH Krützpoort 16 47804 Krefeld / DE | [2009/45] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states Stankiewicz GmbH Hannoversche Strasse 120 D-29352 Adelheidsdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRESER-WOLZENBURG, Thomas Stralsunder Strasse 5a 30827 Garbsen / DE | 02 /
HOFFMANN, Manfred Dorfstrasse 30 29364 Langlingen / DE | 03 /
MILBRADT, Ulrich Tilsiter Weg 1 29339 Wathlingen / DE | [2008/28] |
Former [2008/04] | 01 /
FRESER-WOLZENBURG, Thomas Stralsunder Strasse 5a 30827 Garbsen / DE | ||
02 /
HOFFMANN, Manfred Dorfstrasse 30 29364 Leitlingen / DE | |||
03 /
MILBRADT, Ulrich Tilsiter Weg 1 29339 Wathlingen / DE | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Liesegang, Eva, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/12] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2008/04] | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06742845.8 | 09.05.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006EP04326 | Priority number, date | DE20051021299 | 09.05.2005 Original published format: DE102005021299 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006119963 | Date: | 16.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1879771 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/08, G10K11/162 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
B60R13/0861 (EP,US);
B60R13/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEMENT ZUR SCHALLDÄMMUNG | [2008/04] | English: | ELEMENT FOR SOUND INSULATION | [2008/04] | French: | ELEMENT D'ISOLATION SONORE | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 06.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.06.2012 | 08.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/26] | 18.02.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 19.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.09.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.10.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.03.2009 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2009/18] | 30.09.2009 | Resumption of proceedings | [2009/18] | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2000257442 ; | JP2000257442 [ ]; | [X]JPH08226061 ; | JPH08226061 [ ]; | [X]US4966799 (LUCCA EUSEBIO [IT], et al) [X] 1-8,10,12 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 6 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 6; figure 2 * * column 4, line 1 - line 12 *; | [X]EP0631862 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6* figures 1,2; claim 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 12, & JP2000257442 A 20000919 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEM CO LTD) [X] 1-6,12,13 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 62, Database accession no. 2000-642527, & JP2000257442 A 20000919 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEM CO LTD) [ ] * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 1997, no. 01, & JP08226061 A 19960903 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [X] 1,2,5,6,12,13 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 45, Database accession no. 1996-451281, & JPH08226061 A 19960903 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [ ] * abstract * |