EP1901953 - CLAMPING DEVICE FOR A STEERING COLUMN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILHELM, Sigurd Tachauer Weg 8 Herzogenaurach 91074 / DE | [2008/13] | Application number, filing date | 06743152.8 | 14.06.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006EP05689 | Priority number, date | DE20051031594 | 06.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005031594 | [2008/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007003258 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1901953 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1901953 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/184 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
B62D1/184 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/32] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEMMVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE LENKSÄULE | [2008/13] | English: | CLAMPING DEVICE FOR A STEERING COLUMN | [2008/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE POUR COLONNE DE DIRECTION | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 07.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE10304640 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-9* the whole document * |