EP2017242 - METHODS FOR OBTAINING NITROGENATED FERTILIZERS AND COMPLEXES AND FERTILIZERS THUS OBTAINED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fertinagro Nutrientes, S.L. Pol. Ind. La paz, parcelas 185-188 44195 Teruel / ES | [2009/12] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Iniciativas Agroindustriales de Teruel, S.L. Pol. Ind. La Paz, parcelas 185-188 44195 Teruel / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATARES REAL, Sergio Pol. Ind. La paz, parcelas 185-188 E-44195 Teruel / ES | [2009/04] | Representative(s) | Mato Adrover, Ángel Luis Protectia Patentes y Marcas, S.L. C/ Arte 21, 2[deg]A 28033 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Mato Adrover, Ángel Luis Protectia Patentes y Marcas Calle Caleruega 12, 1[deg]C 28033 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2010/17] | Adrover, Ángel Luis Mato Protectia Patentes y Marcas Calle Caleruega 12, 1[deg]C 28033 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2009/04] | Esteban Perez-Serrano, Maria Isabel UDAPI & Asociados Patentes y Marcas Explanada, 8 28040 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 06743493.6 | 11.05.2006 | [2009/04] | WO2006ES70055 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007132032 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | ES | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2017242 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2017242 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C05D11/00, C05G5/00, C05D9/02 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
C05B7/00 (EP,US);
C05D9/02 (EP);
C05G5/12 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C05B7/00, C05C9/005, C05D5/00, C05D9/00, C05D9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON STICKSTOFFDÜNGERN UND SO ERHALTENE KOMPLEXE UND DÜNGER | [2009/04] | English: | METHODS FOR OBTAINING NITROGENATED FERTILIZERS AND COMPLEXES AND FERTILIZERS THUS OBTAINED | [2009/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR DES ENGRAIS AZOTÉS ET COMPLEXES ET ENGRAIS AINSI OBTENUS | [2009/04] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2008 | Translation filed | 10.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 18.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2006 | AT | 26.12.2012 | BE | 26.12.2012 | CY | 26.12.2012 | CZ | 26.12.2012 | DK | 26.12.2012 | EE | 26.12.2012 | FI | 26.12.2012 | IT | 26.12.2012 | LT | 26.12.2012 | LV | 26.12.2012 | MC | 26.12.2012 | NL | 26.12.2012 | PL | 26.12.2012 | RO | 26.12.2012 | SE | 26.12.2012 | SI | 26.12.2012 | SK | 26.12.2012 | TR | 26.12.2012 | BG | 26.03.2013 | GR | 27.03.2013 | IS | 26.04.2013 | PT | 26.04.2013 | GB | 11.05.2013 | IE | 11.05.2013 | LU | 11.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
TR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
GB | 11.05.2013 | ||
IE | 11.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
GB | 11.05.2013 | ||
IE | 11.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 11.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 26.12.2012 | |
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 26.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1060182 (ICI LTD) [Y] 1-5 * page 1, line 13 - line 32 * * page 1, line 46 - line 79 * * examples 1-3 *; | [X]GB1134465 (AMERICAN CAN CO) [X] 6-8 * example 1 *; | [A]GB1259778 (FISONS LTD) [A] 1-8 * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 8 *; | [A]US4058389 (PICCOLO LUIGI, et al) [A] 1-8 * examples 1-4 * * claims 1-12 *; | [A]US5514201 (MARIJUAN DE SANTIAGO LUIS [ES], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 18 - line 35 * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]WO9627571 (AGRIUM INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 3, line 15 - line 20 * * page 4, line 9 - line 23 * * page 6, line 10 - line 16 ** claims 1-30 *; | [XY]EP1595860 (DUSLO AS [SK]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0008] , [0014] , [0016] , [0022] - [0027] * * examples 1-3 * * claims 1-14 * [Y] 1-5 |