EP1902123 - LAVATORY BLOCK COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Revocation of patent | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reckitt Benckiser LLC Morris Corporate Center IV 399 Interpace Parkway Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | [2011/20] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Reckitt Benckiser LLC Morris Corporate Center IV 399 Interpace Parkway Parsippany NJ 07054 / US | ||
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states Reckitt, Benckiser, Inc. Morris Corp. Center IV, 399 Interpace Parkway Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEUNG, Tak-Wai 1758 South 36th Drive Yuma, Arizona 85364 / US | 02 /
FU, Edward c/o Reckitt Benckiser Inc One Philips Parkway Montvale, NJ 07645 / US | 03 /
NGUYEN, Tri 148 Eyland Avenue Succasunna, New Jersey 07876 / US | 04 /
WU, Steven c/o Reckitt Benckiser Inc One Philips Parkway Montvale, NJ 07645 / US | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Bowers, Craig Malcolm, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Bowers, Craig Malcolm, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | ||
Former [2008/13] | Bowers, Craig Malcolm, et al Reckitt Benckiser plc Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 06743969.5 | 23.05.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006GB01892 | Priority number, date | US20050692992P | 22.06.2005 Original published format: US 692992 P | GB20050020990 | 17.10.2005 Original published format: GB 0520990 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006136773 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1902123 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1902123 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, A61L9/05, C11D1/52 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
C11D1/65 (EP,US);
C11D1/12 (GB);
A61L9/05 (EP,US);
C11D1/42 (GB);
C11D1/655 (EP,US);
C11D17/0047 (EP,US);
C11D17/0056 (EP,GB,US);
C11D3/0005 (GB);
C11D3/046 (EP,US);
C11D3/124 (EP,US);
C11D3/39 (EP,US);
C11D3/43 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TOILETTENBLOCK | [2008/13] | English: | LAVATORY BLOCK COMPOSITION | [2008/13] | French: | COMPOSITION DE BLOCS DE TOILETTES | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 01.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.02.2012
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2012/13] | 23.03.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.07.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.11.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/17] | 05.12.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.05.2011 | BE | 18.05.2011 | CY | 18.05.2011 | CZ | 18.05.2011 | DK | 18.05.2011 | EE | 18.05.2011 | FI | 18.05.2011 | HU | 18.05.2011 | LT | 18.05.2011 | LV | 18.05.2011 | NL | 18.05.2011 | PL | 18.05.2011 | RO | 18.05.2011 | SE | 18.05.2011 | SI | 18.05.2011 | SK | 18.05.2011 | TR | 18.05.2011 | IE | 23.05.2011 | LU | 23.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | BG | 18.08.2011 | GR | 19.08.2011 | IS | 18.09.2011 | PT | 19.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
TR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 23.05.2011 | ||
LU | 23.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 23.05.2011 | ||
LU | 23.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 18.05.2011 | |
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 18.05.2011 | |
PT | 19.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4578207 (HOLDT BERND-DIETER [DE], et al); | [AD]US5939372 (SCHMID KARL [DE], et al) |