EP1973838 - A METHOD FOR GAS STORAGE, TRANSPORT, AND ENERGY GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERIOT-WATT UNIVERSITY Riccarton Edinburgh EH14 4AS / GB | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOHIDI, Bahman 14 Easter Currie Terrace Currie Midlothian EH14 5LG / GB | 02 /
YANG, Jinhai 44/4 Wester Hailes Park Edinburgh EH14 3AQ / GB | 03 /
CHAPOY, Anthony 31 Grahamsdyke Road Bo'ness, EH 51 9ED / GB | 04 /
ANDERSON, Ross Woodview, 5 Chapel Mains Galashiels, TD1 2PN / GB | 05 /
ARJMANDI, Mosayyeb 14/5 West Fairbrae Drive Edinburgh EH11 3SY / GB | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 06744145.1 | 07.06.2006 | [2008/40] | WO2006GB02092 | Priority number, date | GB20050011546 | 07.06.2005 Original published format: GB 0511546 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006131738 | Date: | 14.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1973838 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/00 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
C10L3/10 (EP,US);
C01B3/001 (EP,US);
C01B3/0015 (EP,US);
C10L3/108 (EP,US);
Y02E60/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SPEICHERN UND TRANSPORTIEREN VON GAS UND ZUR ENERGIEERZEUGUNG | [2008/40] | English: | A METHOD FOR GAS STORAGE, TRANSPORT, AND ENERGY GENERATION | [2008/40] | French: | PROCEDE DE STOCKAGE ET DE TRANSPORT DE GAZ ET DE PRODUCTION D'ENERGIE | [2008/40] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 01.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/02] | 13.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3976584 (LEIFER LESLIE) [Y] 4 * abstract * * columns 1-3 *; | [XY] - SHIMADA, EBINUMA, OYAMA, KAMATA, TAKEYA, UCHIDA, NAGAO, NARITA, "Separation of Gas Molecule Using Tetra-n-butyl Ammonium Bromide Semi-Clathrate Hydrate Crystals", JPN J APPL PHYS PART 222, ISSN:0021-4922, Japan, (2003), vol. 42, no. 2A, pages L129 - L131, XP002478182 [X] 1-3,5-9 * the whole document * [Y] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.42.L129 | [A] - G.A. JEFFREY, "Hydrate Inclusion Compounds", JOURNAL OF INCLUSION PHENOMENA, (198409), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 211 - 222, XP002478183 [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 216 - page 217 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00656757 | [AD] - LIPKOWSKI J ET AL, "THE STRUCTURE OF TETRABUTYLAMMONIUM BROMIDE HYDRATE (C4H9)4NBR.21/3H2O", JOURNAL OF SUPRAMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, (2002), vol. 2, ISSN 1472-7862, pages 435 - 439, XP008052322 [AD] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1472-7862(03)00054-6 | [A] - LEE H ET AL, "Tuning clathrate hydrates for hydrogen storage", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, (20050407), vol. 434, no. 7034, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 743 - 746, XP003002309 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature03457 |