EP1867022 - ROTATING STRIPPING HEAD FOR CABLE STRIPPING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schleuniger Holding AG Bierigutstrasse 9 3608 Thun / CH | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPAN, Jiri St. Gallerstrasse 76 CH-7320 Sargans / CH | 02 /
STEPAN, Thomas St. Gallerstrasse 76 CH-7320 Sargans / CH | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Rosenich, Paul PPR AG Rotenbodenstrasse 12 9497 Triesenberg / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | Rosenich, Paul Patentbüro Paul Rosenich AG BGZ 9497 Triesenberg / LI | ||
Former [2007/51] | Rosenich, Paul Patentbüro Paul Rosenich AG BGZ 9497 Triesenberg / LI | Application number, filing date | 06744457.0 | 27.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006IB00683 | Priority number, date | CH20050058805 | 25.03.2005 Original published format: CH 588052005 | US20050594293P | 25.03.2005 Original published format: US 594293 P | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006100590 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1867022 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1867022 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/24, H02G1/12, // G02B6/245, G02B6/44 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
H02G1/1265 (EP,US);
G02B6/24 (KR);
G02B6/566 (EP,US);
G02B6/245 (EP,US);
Y10T29/514 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/51] | H02G1/12, G02B6/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ROTIERENDER ABISOLIERKOPF FÜR KABELABISOLIERVORRICHTUNGEN | [2007/51] | English: | ROTATING STRIPPING HEAD FOR CABLE STRIPPING APPARATUS | [2007/51] | French: | TÊTE DE DÉNUDAGE ROTATIVE DESTINÉE À UN APPAREIL DE DÉNUDAGE | [2016/32] |
Former [2007/51] | TETE DE DENUDAGE DESTINEE A UN APPAREIL DE DENUDAGE | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 04.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2006 | AT | 02.11.2016 | BE | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | CZ | 02.11.2016 | DK | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | ES | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | IT | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | LV | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | NL | 02.11.2016 | PL | 02.11.2016 | RO | 02.11.2016 | SE | 02.11.2016 | SI | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | TR | 02.11.2016 | BG | 02.02.2017 | GR | 03.02.2017 | IS | 02.03.2017 | PT | 02.03.2017 | GB | 27.03.2017 | IE | 27.03.2017 | LU | 27.03.2017 | FR | 31.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 27.03.2006 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 27.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.03.2006 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 27.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
GB | 27.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 02.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5243882 (STEPAN JIRI [CH]) [A] 1-37 * abstract *; | [DX]US5361384 (STEPAN JIRI [CH]) [DX] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US5582078 (TALLEY LLOYD A [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]US6176155 (PALMOWSKI DAVID [US], et al) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US6286393 (MESSER JUERG [CH], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2002029663 (HOMBU KOUSUKE [JP]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE20117931U (FEINTECHNIK R RITTMEYER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-37 * abstract * | by applicant | US5010797 | US5243882 | US5361384 | US6176155 | US6321621 | WO2004IB03020 |