|
21.11.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.11.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2019 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
26 |
|
02.07.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2019 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.05.2019 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
18.04.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
12.04.2019 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2019 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2019 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2019 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
22 |
|
24.01.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
22 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2018 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2016 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2016 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
11 |
|
15.03.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
32 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
32 |
|
05.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2015 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Minutes of the taking of evidence |
Opposition |
23 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.04.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
19 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
47 |
|
05.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
47 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
23 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
23 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
17 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.02.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.01.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
61 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
24 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
94 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
74 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
24 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
102 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2010 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.03.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
22.10.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2007 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |