EP1874379 - VENTILATOR CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/02] | VENTILATOR CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR THE USE THEREOF | ||
[2019/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trudell Medical International 725 Baransway Drive London, Ontario N5V 5G4 / CA | [2019/47] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states Trudell Medical International 725 Third Street London Ontario N5V 5G4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOLEY, Martin 381 Grangeover Street London, Ontario N6G 4K8 / CA | [2020/34] |
Former [2008/02] | 01 /
TRUDELL MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL 535 Waterford Drive Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US | ||
02 /
FOLEY, Martin 381 Grangeover Street London, Ontario N6G 4K8 / CA | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/34] |
Former [2008/02] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06744576.7 | 26.04.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006IB01027 | Priority number, date | US20050675944P | 28.04.2005 Original published format: US 675944 P | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006114699 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1874379 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1874379 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 28.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00, A61M11/00, A61M16/00, // A61M16/08 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
A61M15/0065 (EP,US);
A61M16/14 (US);
A61M15/0015 (EP,US);
A61M15/0018 (EP,US);
A61M15/0021 (US);
A61M15/0086 (EP,US);
A61M15/009 (US);
A61M16/04 (US);
A61M16/06 (US);
A61M16/0816 (US);
A61M16/0833 (EP,US);
A61M16/0891 (US);
A61M16/208 (US);
A61M16/08 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0233 (EP,US);
A61M2240/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/18] | A61M15/00, A61M11/00, A61M16/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/02] | A61M15/00, A61M11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2020/34] |
Former [2008/32] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VENTILATORKREISLAUF | [2019/51] | English: | VENTILATOR CIRCUIT | [2019/51] | French: | CIRCUIT DE VENTILATEUR | [2019/51] |
Former [2008/02] | VENTILATORKREISLAUF UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2008/02] | VENTILATOR CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR THE USE THEREOF | ||
Former [2008/02] | INHALATEUR ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 20.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 09.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 19.08.2020 | IT | 19.08.2020 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/25] | ES | 19.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3028873 (KINDRED BOB A) [A] 1* column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 33; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4534343 (NOWACKI CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 42; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]CA2354561 (CIPLA LTD [IN]) [Y] 14 * page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; figures 1-5; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US6622725 (FISHER JOSEPH A [CA], et al) [A] 1 * column 8, line 18 - line 65; figure 1 *; | [XDY]US2005039746 (GRYCHOWSKI JERRY R [US], et al) [XD] 1 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-9 * [Y] 2,3,14 | International search | [A]EP0281650 (BRUGGER STEPHAN [DE]); | [X]US5002048 (MAKIEJ JR WALTER J [US]); | [X]CA2210721 (BALLARD MED PROD [US]); | [X]CA2329126 (INFAMED LTD [AU]); | [Y]CA2354561 (CIPLA LTD [IN]); | [X]CA2493078 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]); | [X]CA2515593 (TRUDELL MEDICAL INT [CA]); | [X]CA2424731 (FARMER MICHAEL W [US]); | [XP]US2005217667 (DHUPER SUNIL [US], et al) |