EP1868936 - DEVICE FOR DISPENSING LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CELLI S.p.A. Via Rovereta, 34 47852 Coriano (Rimini) / IT | [2007/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CELLI, Goffredo Via Leopardi, 17, Fraz. Cerasolo Ausa I-47852 Coriano / IT | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Zanotti, Laura, et al Bugnion S.p.A Via A. Valentini, 11/15 47922 Rimini / IT | [2011/40] |
Former [2007/52] | Paolizzi, Marco, et al C/o Bugnion S.p.A. Via A. Valentini, 11/15 47900 Rimini / IT | Application number, filing date | 06744632.8 | 16.03.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006IB01123 | Priority number, date | IT2005RN00022 | 31.03.2005 Original published format: IT RN20050022 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006103566 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1868936 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/08, B67D1/14 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
B67D1/06 (EP);
B67D1/0865 (EP);
B67D2210/00128 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Extension states | AL | 30.08.2007 | BA | 30.08.2007 | HR | 30.08.2007 | MK | 30.08.2007 | YU | 30.08.2007 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSGABE VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2007/52] | English: | DEVICE FOR DISPENSING LIQUIDS | [2007/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE LIQUIDES | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 19.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 07.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2771752 (TENNANT EDWARD E) [X] 1-3,5,21-24 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 71; figure 1 *; | [X]US2485610 (KROMER WALLACE R) [X] 1,9 * column 4, line 5 - column 6, line 40; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2004011828 (VAN DER KLAAUW GUIDO PETRUS JOHANNES ET AL) [A] 25 * paragraph [0039]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2003062386 (DERRY NICK RICHARD ET AL); | [A]US5291004 (FRANK ET AL); | [A]US5564602 (CLELAND ET AL); | [A]US5009082 (ABRAHAM, III ET AL); | [A]US5573145 (GROH ET AL); | [A]US5368205 (GROH ET AL); | [A]US2362104 (SMITH LEONARD C) |