EP1889426 - CIRCUIT-SWITCHED AND MULTIMEDIA SUBSYSTEM VOICE CONTINUITY WITH BEARER PATH INTERRUPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2021/09] |
Former [2013/48] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | ||
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St Laurent, Québec H4S 2A9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHDI, Kaniz 1710 E. Branch Hollow Drive Carrollton, TX 75007 / US | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25-26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | ||
Former [2012/25] | Noble, Nicholas, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/08] | Boyce, Conor, et al F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 06744764.9 | 24.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006IB01362 | Priority number, date | US20050685645P | 27.05.2005 Original published format: US 685645 P | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006126072 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1889426 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1889426 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 30.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/66, H04L12/50, H04L12/28, H04M11/06 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
H04L65/103 (EP,US);
H04L65/104 (EP,US);
H04L65/1095 (EP);
H04M3/56 (EP,US);
H04M7/06 (EP,US);
H04W36/0022 (US);
H04W36/00226 (EP);
H04W36/02 (EP,US);
H04M2207/20 (EP,US);
H04M7/1205 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13098 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13109 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13166 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13167 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13176 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13201 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13248 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/08] | H04L12/66, H04L12/50, H04L12/28, H04M11/06, H04Q3/64, H04Q7/20, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/09] |
Former [2008/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LEITUNGSVERMITTLUNGS- UND MULTIMEDIA-SUBSYSTEM-VOICE-KONTINUITÄT MIT TRÄGERPFADUNTERBRECHUNG | [2008/08] | English: | CIRCUIT-SWITCHED AND MULTIMEDIA SUBSYSTEM VOICE CONTINUITY WITH BEARER PATH INTERRUPTION | [2008/08] | French: | CONTINUITE DE SOUS SYSTEME MULTIMEDIA A COMMUTATION DE CIRCUIT AVEC INTERRUPTION DU TRAJET DE PORTEUSE | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 25.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 25.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.05.2006 | AT | 03.03.2021 | CY | 03.03.2021 | CZ | 03.03.2021 | DK | 03.03.2021 | EE | 03.03.2021 | ES | 03.03.2021 | FI | 03.03.2021 | IT | 03.03.2021 | LT | 03.03.2021 | LV | 03.03.2021 | MC | 03.03.2021 | NL | 03.03.2021 | PL | 03.03.2021 | RO | 03.03.2021 | SE | 03.03.2021 | SI | 03.03.2021 | SK | 03.03.2021 | IE | 24.05.2021 | LU | 24.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | BG | 03.06.2021 | GR | 04.06.2021 | IS | 03.07.2021 | PT | 05.07.2021 | [2023/27] |
Former [2023/24] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 24.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 24.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 24.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 24.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
LU | 24.05.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003174688 (AHMED WALID [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0095] *; | [X]US6721565 (EJZAK RICHARD PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-28 * abstract * * columns 1-15 * * figures 1,2,7-9 *; | [A]US2004246990 (KRISHNAMURTHI GOVIND [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * abstract ** paragraphs [0001] - [0044] *; | [A]US2004259549 (EJZAK RICHARD PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0057] * * figure 2 * | International search | [X]US6721565 (EJZAK RICHARD PAUL [US], et al); | [A]CA2501991 (KINETO WIRELESS INC [US]); | [A]US2004246990 (KRISHNAMURTHI GOVIND [US], et al); | [AP]US2006002355 (BAEK HYE-WON [KR], et al); | [A] - STRATER J. ET AL., "Seamless Mobility Between Home Networks and Cable Services", MOTOROLA WHITE PAPER, (20050527), XP003004261 | by applicant | US6721565 |