EP1896768 - LIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARRA, Johan C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
DE BOER, Dirk, K., G. C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Bekkers, Joost J.J., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/25] | Bekkers, Joost J.J, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/11] | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06744919.9 | 12.05.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006IB51491 | Priority number, date | EP20050104566 | 27.05.2005 Original published format: EP 05104566 | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006126129 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1896768 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F21V8/00, G02B6/00, G02F1/13357, G09F9/37, G02B26/02 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
G02B6/0033 (EP,US);
G02B26/02 (KR);
G02B26/004 (EP,US);
G02B6/00 (KR);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G09F9/37 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/11] | English: | LIGHTING DEVICE | [2008/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ECLAIRAGE | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 16.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1069450 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * figures 19A,19B,1-3C * * paragraph [0201] - paragraph [0217] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0044] * * claims 7,20 *; | [A]US5659330 (SHERIDON NICHOLAS K [US]) [A] 2,9,10 * figures 1-10,13,14 * * column 2, line 28 - column 5, line 67 * * column 6, line 9 - line 37 *; | [A]GB1205236 (INT COMPUTERS LTD [GB]) [A] 4,5,8 * sentence 43 - sentence 89 * * figure - *; | [A]US5995288 (KASHIMA KEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 5-7,11 * figures 22-26 * * column 18, line 59 - column 20, line 4 *; | [A]EP1103757 (SPECTRAL GES FUER LICHTTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 5,12 * figures 1-3,6 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0049] *; | [A]WO9928890 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 5,8 * figures 1,2,3A,3B * * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 14 * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 14 * |