EP1881596 - MOTOR DRIVE SYSTEM CONTROL DEVICE AND ELECTRIC VEHICLE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2018/37] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAMURA, Masaki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2018/37] |
Former [2018/23] | 01 /
OKAMURA, Masaki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2018/10] | 01 /
OKAMURA, Masaki TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 4718571 / JP | ||
Former [2008/04] | 01 /
OKAMURA, Masaki, TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 4718571 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2018/37] |
Former [2008/04] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06746251.5 | 01.05.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006JP309442 | Priority number, date | JP20050137063 | 10.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005137063 | [2008/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006121093 | Date: | 16.11.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1881596 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1881596 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02P27/08, H02P27/06 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
H02P21/06 (EP,US);
H02P21/0089 (EP,US);
H02P6/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2018/37] |
Former [2008/33] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES MOTORANTRIEBSSYSTEMS UND DIESE EINSETZENDES ELEKTRISCHES FAHRZEUG | [2008/04] | English: | MOTOR DRIVE SYSTEM CONTROL DEVICE AND ELECTRIC VEHICLE USING THE SAME | [2008/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION DE SYSTEME DE COMMANDE MOTEUR ET VEHICULE ELECTRIQUE UTILISANT LEDIT DISPOSITIF | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2007 | Translation filed | 13.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 16.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 01.05.2019 | FR | 31.05.2019 | [2020/29] |
Former [2020/24] | GB | 01.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0197102 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1,2,6,7,11 * abstract *; | [A]EP0825059 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract ** column 6, line 43 - column 9, line 6 *; | [Y]WO2005013473 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,6,7,11 * abstract * * page 4, line 13 - page 7, line 25 * | Examination | US2003155878 |