EP1881298 - POSITION SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | [2009/08] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIWA, Masahisa, Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 02 /
INOOKA, Yukiko, Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Appelt, Christian W. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | Appelt, Christian W. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Anwaltssozietät Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06746331.5 | 12.05.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006JP309534 | Priority number, date | JP20050140207 | 12.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005140207 | JP20050140208 | 12.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005140208 | [2008/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006121146 | Date: | 16.11.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1881298 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/20 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
G01D3/02 (EP,US);
G01D5/20 (KR);
G01D5/2013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/34] |
Former [2008/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIONSSENSOR | [2008/04] | English: | POSITION SENSOR | [2008/04] | French: | CAPTEUR DE POSITION | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2007 | Translation filed | 12.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 10.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/48] | 13.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/48] | Divisional application(s) | EP10006298.3 / EP2236989 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0258468 (VICKERS SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,11 * column 4, line 21 - column 7, line 4; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US5003258 (MANCINI NICOLAS [CH]) [Y] 1,8 * column 3, line 13 - line 47; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0447017 (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [A] 1,3* column 4, line 35 - column 7, line 24; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]DE4225533 (HOTTINGER MESSTECHNIK BALDWIN [DE]) [Y] 1,8 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 50; figures 1,2 * |