EP1884705 - LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2008/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Hiroshi 1-3-27-401, Nikkocho, Fuchu-shi, Tokyo 1830044 / JP | [2008/06] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/06] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06746801.7 | 24.05.2006 | [2008/06] | WO2006JP310370 | Priority number, date | JP20050151145 | 24.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005151145 | [2008/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006126597 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1884705 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F21S2/00, F21V14/00, F21V19/02, G03B21/14, F21Y101/02 | [2008/06] | CPC: |
G03B21/2013 (EP,US);
G03B21/2033 (EP,US);
G03B21/206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/26] |
Former [2008/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTQUELLENVORRICHTUNG | [2008/06] | English: | LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE | [2008/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF SOURCE LUMINEUSE | [2008/06] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2007 | Translation filed | 14.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/06] | 28.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1395064 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-9 * abstract ** paragraph [0061] * |