EP1875037 - VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weir Norge A.S. P.O. Box 2108 3103 To̸nsberg / NO | For all designated states Sontvedt, Terje Sondre Gjettum 58 1346 Gjettum / NO | [2009/18] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states Weir Norge A.S. Strandveien 50 1366 Lysaker / NO | ||
For all designated states Sontvedt, Terje Sondre Gjettum 58 1346 Gjettum / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSEN, Bjarne Bestumveien 75H 0283 Oslo / NO | 02 /
ALMDAHL, Per M. Trygve Stro̸mbergs vei 5A 1263 Oslo / NO | 03 /
SO̸NTVEDT, Terje So̸ndre Gjettum 58 1346 Gjettum / NO | [2008/39] |
Former [2008/02] | 01 /
OLSEN, Bjarne Bestumveien 75H 0283 Oslo / NO | Representative(s) | Tofting, Arild, et al Protector IP Consultants AS Oscarsgate 20 0352 Oslo / NO | [2010/03] |
Former [2008/52] | Tofting, Arild, et al Protector Intellectual Property Consultants AS P.O. Box 5074 Majorstuen 0301 Oslo / NO | ||
Former [2008/02] | Karlström, Lennart Noréns Patentbyra AB, Box 10198 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 06747612.7 | 28.03.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006NO00115 | Priority number, date | NO20050001778 | 11.04.2005 Original published format: NO 20051778 | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006110039 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1875037 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1875037 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E21B34/02 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
F17D1/05 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87676 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTIL | [2008/02] | English: | VALVE | [2008/02] | French: | VANNE | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 01.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.05.2009 | BE | 06.05.2009 | CY | 06.05.2009 | CZ | 06.05.2009 | EE | 06.05.2009 | FI | 06.05.2009 | LT | 06.05.2009 | LV | 06.05.2009 | PL | 06.05.2009 | RO | 06.05.2009 | SI | 06.05.2009 | SK | 06.05.2009 | TR | 06.05.2009 | BG | 06.08.2009 | SE | 06.08.2009 | GR | 07.08.2009 | ES | 17.08.2009 | IS | 06.09.2009 | PT | 06.09.2009 | HU | 07.11.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CY | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
LV | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
HU | 07.11.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CY | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
LV | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
LV | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
LV | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
LV | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
LV | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1986600 (PIGOTT REGINALD J S) [A] 1-13,1-13,1-13 * the whole document * * the whole document ** the whole document *; | [A]US2672159 (WALTON ROBERT O) [A] 1-13,1-13,1-13 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [Y]US3480037 (ALEXANDER GRANISON T JR) [Y] 7-11,7-11,7-11 * column 3, line 15 - column 3, line 49; figure 4 * * column 3, line 15 - column 3, line 49; figure 4 * * column 3, line 15 - column 3, line 49; figure 4 *; | [XY]US4356997 (BEFFANO JOHN J) [X] 1-6,12,13,1-6,12,13,1-6,12,13 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 28; figure 1 * * the whole document * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 28; figure 1 * * the whole document * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 28; figure 1 * * the whole document * [Y] 7-11,7-11,7-11; | [A]US4444220 (SEGER FRITZ O [US]) [A] 1-13,1-13,1-13 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [Y]US5201491 (DOMANGUE KENNETH J [US]) [Y] 1-13,1-13,1-13 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [Y]US5241980 (CORTE BOBBY J [US]) [Y] 7-11,7-11,7-11 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9905395 (CAMCO INT [US]) [Y] 1-13,1-13,1-13 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [XY]US2004140088 (MENTESH IBRAHIM M [US], et al) [X] 1-6,12,13,1-6,12,13,1-6,12,13 * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 2, paragraph 30; figures 1,2 * * the whole document * * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 2, paragraph 30; figures 1,2 * * the whole document * * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 2, paragraph 30; figures 1,2 * * the whole document * [Y] 7-11,7-11,7-11 |