EP2033292 - MODULAR HVDC CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2017/13] |
Former [2017/01] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states ABB T&D Technology Ltd. Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASPLUND, Gunnar Vasagatan 15 S-771 32 Ludvika / SE | 02 /
HYTTINEN, Mats Anisstigen 11 S-771 43 Ludvika / SE | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Axell, Kristina, et al ABB AB Intellectual Property Forskargränd 7 721 78 Västerås / SE | [2017/13] |
Former [2009/11] | Kock, Ina ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | Application number, filing date | 06748065.7 | 28.06.2006 | [2009/11] | WO2006SE50226 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008002226 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2033292 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2033292 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/36, H02M7/00, H02M7/162, H02M7/19, H02M1/32, H02M7/757, H02M1/00, H02M7/5387 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
H02M7/7575 (EP,US);
H02J3/36 (EP,US);
H02M7/003 (EP,US);
H02M7/19 (EP,US);
H02M7/5387 (EP,US);
H02M1/0074 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | H02J3/36, H02M3/158, H02M7/5387, H02M7/42, H02M7/757, H02M1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/11] | H02J3/36, H02M3/158, H02M7/5387 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2009/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARER HVDC-KONVERTER | [2009/11] | English: | MODULAR HVDC CONVERTER | [2009/11] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR CCHT MODULAIRE | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 15.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 07.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2006 | AT | 29.03.2017 | CY | 29.03.2017 | CZ | 29.03.2017 | DK | 29.03.2017 | EE | 29.03.2017 | ES | 29.03.2017 | FI | 29.03.2017 | IT | 29.03.2017 | LT | 29.03.2017 | LV | 29.03.2017 | MC | 29.03.2017 | NL | 29.03.2017 | PL | 29.03.2017 | RO | 29.03.2017 | SE | 29.03.2017 | SI | 29.03.2017 | SK | 29.03.2017 | TR | 29.03.2017 | IE | 28.06.2017 | LU | 28.06.2017 | BG | 29.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | GR | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | IS | 29.07.2017 | PT | 31.07.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.06.2006 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.06.2006 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 29.03.2017 | |
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004130215 (MURAMATSU JUN [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 5,15 * * paragraphs [0071] , [0121] - [0126] *; | [YD]WO0152379 (ABB AB [SE], et al) [YD] 1-17 * abstract * * figure 5 * * page 25, line 35 - page 26, column 15 * | International search | [X]WO03044939 (DANFOSS DRIVES AS [DK], et al); | [X]EP0695024 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [X]US4941079 (OOI BOON TECK [CA]); | [X]US4019115 (LIPS HANS-PETER); | [A]WO2005078889 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO0152379 (ABB AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO0074198 (ABB AB [SE], et al); | [A]US6865080 (RADOSEVICH LAWRENCE D [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1385259 |