EP1871263 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LASER LIPOLYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EL.EN. S.p.A. Via Baldanzese, 17 50041 Calenzano (Firenze) / IT | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, George, E., S. 2 Jordan Road Hopkinton, Massachusetts 01748 / US | 02 /
MASOTTI, Leonardo Via Bolognese, 81 I-50010 Montorsoli-Sesto Fiorentino / IT | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 06748368.5 | 10.03.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006US09006 | Priority number, date | US20050099216 | 05.04.2005 Original published format: US 99216 | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006107522 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1871263 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/22 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
A61B18/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/00057 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/00084 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00005 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00464 (US);
A61B2018/2288 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE LASERLIPOLYSE | [2008/01] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LASER LIPOLYSIS | [2008/01] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE LASERLIPOLYSE | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 21.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/33] | 26.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/33] | Divisional application(s) | EP08162477.7 / EP1992301 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5343543 (NOVAK JR JOHN P [US], et al) [Y] 9,10 * column 3, line 4 - line 25 *; | [X]US5495541 (MURRAY STEVEN C [US], et al) [X] 22,30 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 17 *; | [A]US6106516 (MASSENGILL R KEMP [US]) [A] 1,22* abstract *; | [Y]US6206873 (PAOLINI CESARE [IT], et al) [Y] 2,3,11,12,14,15 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE10320984 (HARRER MANUEL [DE]) [X] 1,4-8,13,16,22,23,30 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0049]; figure 1c * [Y] 2,3,9-12,14,15 | by applicant | US5954710 |