EP1866824 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREDICTION OF DRUG METABOLISM, TOXICITY, MODE OF ACTION, AND SIDE EFFECTS OF NOVEL SMALL MOLECULE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GeneGo, Inc. 169 Saxony Road, Nr. 104 Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | [2011/04] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states Ekins, Sean 610 Runnymede Avenue Jenkintown PA 19046 / US | ||
For all designated states Bugrim, Andrej 1011 Pearl Street St. Joseph MI 49085 / US | |||
For all designated states Nikolskaya, Tatiana 21 Chrismar Road Portage IN 46368 / US | |||
For all designated states Nikolsky, Yuri 21 Chrisma Road Portage IN 46368 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ekins, Sean 610 Runnymede Avenue Jenkintown, PA 19046 / US | 02 /
Bugrim, Andrej 1011 Pearl Street St. Joseph, MI 49085 / US | 03 /
Nikolskaya, Tatiana 21 Chrismar Road Portage, IN 46368 / US | 04 /
Nikolsky, Yuri 21 Chrisma Road Portage, IN 46368 / US | [2011/04] |
Former [2007/51] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2007/51] | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06748475.8 | 17.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006US10053 | Priority number, date | US20050662699P | 17.03.2005 Original published format: US 662699 P | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006099624 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1866824 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, G01N33/48, G06G7/48 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
G16C20/30 (EP);
G16B35/00 (GB);
G16B20/20 (EP,GB,US);
G16B5/00 (EP,GB,US);
G16C20/60 (GB);
G16B20/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/09] | G01N33/48, G06G7/48 | ||
Former IPC [2007/51] | G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE DES ARZNEIMITTELMETABOLISMUS, DER TOXIZITÄT, DER WIRKUNGSWEISE UND DER NEBENEFFEKTE NEUER KLEINMOLEKÜLVERBINDUNGEN | [2007/51] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREDICTION OF DRUG METABOLISM, TOXICITY, MODE OF ACTION, AND SIDE EFFECTS OF NOVEL SMALL MOLECULE COMPOUNDS | [2007/51] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR PREDIRE LE METABOLISME, LA TOXICITE, LE MODE D'ACTION, ET LES EFFETS SECONDAIRES DE NOUVEAUX COMPOSES CONSTITUES DE PETITES MOLECULES CHEZ L'ETRE HUMAIN | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 05.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/42] | 01.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 01.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.05.2009 | 31.03.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   06.04.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - BUGRIM ANDREJ ET AL, "Early prediction of drug metabolism and toxicity: Systems biology approach and modeling.", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, (20040201), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 1359-6446, pages 127 - 135, XP002532445 [X] 1-43 * the whole document * * in particular * * page 132, column R, line 20 - page 134, column L, line 21 * * figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6446(03)02971-4 | [X] - EKINS S ET AL, "Techniques: Application of systems biology to absorption, distribution, metabolism, excretion and toxicity", TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, ELSEVIER, HAYWARTH, GB, (20050303), vol. 26, no. 4, ISSN 0165-6147, pages 202 - 209, XP004829254 [X] 1-43 * the whole document * * in particular * * abstract * * page 202, column R, lines 14-41 * * page 204, column L, line 25 - column R, line 6 * * page 205, column L, lines 19-24 * * page 205, column L, lines 52-61 * * page 206, column R, line 11 - page 207, column L, line 23 * * page 207, column L, line 45 - column R, line 9 * * figures 2-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tips.2005.02.006 | [X] - EKINS SEAN ET AL, "A novel method for visualizing nuclear hormone receptor networks relevant to drug metabolism.", DRUG METABOLISM AND DISPOSITION: THE BIOLOGICAL FATE OF CHEMICALS MAR 2005, (200503), vol. 33, no. 3, ISSN 0090-9556, pages 474 - 481, XP002532446 [X] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/DMD.104.002717 | [A] - EKINS S, "In silico approaches to predicting drug metabolism, toxicology and beyond.", BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, (200306), vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 0300-5127, pages 611 - 614, XP002532447 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BST0310611 | [A] - SCOTT BOYER ET AL, "New methods in predictive metabolism", JOURNAL OF COMPUTER-AIDED MOLECULAR DESIGN, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20020501), vol. 16, no. 5-6, ISSN 1573-4951, pages 403 - 413, XP019248057 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * | [PX] - EKINS SEAN ET AL, "A combined approach to drug metabolism and toxicity assessment", DRUG METABOLISM AND DISPOSITION, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20060301), vol. 34, no. 3, ISSN 0090-9556, pages 495 - 503, XP002488587 [PX] 1-43 * the whole document * | [PX] - EKINS SEAN ET AL, "Computational prediction of human drug metabolism", EXPERT OPINION ON DRUG METABOLISM & TOXICOLOGY, ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS, LONDON, GB, (20050801), vol. 1, no. 2, ISSN 1742-5255, pages 303 - 324, XP009091066 [PX] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/17425255.1.2.303 | [PX] - NIKOLSKY Y ET AL, "Biological networks and analysis of experimental data in drug discovery", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, ELSEVIER, RAHWAY, NJ, US, (20050501), vol. 10, no. 9, ISSN 1359-6446, pages 653 - 662, XP004890889 [PX] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6446(05)03420-3 | International search | [Y]US6365131 (DOSHI MADHUKANT MANSUKHLAL [IN], et al); | [Y] - EKINS ET AL., "Application of three-dimensional quantitative structure-activity relationships of P-Glycoprotein inhibitors and substrates", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (2002), vol. 61, no. 5, pages 974 - 981, XP008091584 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/mol.61.5.974 | [Y] - SCHUETZ ET AL., "Modulators and substrates of P-Glycoprotein and cytochrome P4503A coordinately up-regulate these proteins un human colon carcinoma cells", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (1996), vol. 49, no. 2, pages 311 - 318, XP000906895 |