EP1869414 - DEVICES, SYSTEMS, METHODS AND TOOLS FOR CONTINUOUS GLUCOSE MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkal Medical, Inc. 46575 Fremont Boulevard Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2007/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JINA, Arvind, N. 3353 Colonna Avenue San Jose, California 95148 / US | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Crowhurst, Charlotte Waveney Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Crowhurst, Charlotte Waveney Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2007/52] | Dee, Ian Mark Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06748841.1 | 28.03.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006US11382 | Priority number, date | US20050666775P | 29.03.2005 Original published format: US 666775 P | US20050743080P | 27.12.2005 Original published format: US 743080 P | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006105146 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1869414 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/05 | [2008/06] | CPC: |
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/14514 (EP,US);
A61B5/14865 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/52] | G01F1/64, G01N33/487 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND WERKZEUGE ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN GLUCOSEÜBERWACHUNG | [2007/52] | English: | DEVICES, SYSTEMS, METHODS AND TOOLS FOR CONTINUOUS GLUCOSE MONITORING | [2007/52] | French: | DISPOSITIFS, SYSTEMES, PROCEDES ET OUTILS POUR LA SURVEILLANCE CONTINUE DU GLUCOSE | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 25.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 11.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6652478 (GARTSTEIN VLADIMIR [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,9,10,12,14 * column 21, line 28 - column 22, line 28 * * column 25, line 46 - column 26, line 31 * [I] 2,4,6-8,11,13,15; | [XI]US2004096959 (STIENE MATTHIAS [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-5,12,14 * paragraphs [0060] , [0113] - [0124]; claims 42-44 *[I] 2,6-11,13,15; | [XI]US2005027179 (BERNER BRET [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,13,14 * paragraphs [0050] , [0051] , [0064] - [0068] - [0079] , [0106] * [I] 2,15 | International search | [X]US2003143746 (SAGE BURTON H [US]) | by applicant | US6652478 | US2005027179 | US2004096959 | US2003143746 |