EP1864452 - PACKET FLOW CONTROL BY CONTROLLING THE LENGTH OF THE INTER-PACKET GAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.02.2009 [2009/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WADEKAR, Manoj 3254 Capriana Circle San Jose, California 95135 / US | 02 /
RASTOGI, Hitesh 4325 Renaissance Dr 118 San Jose, California 95124 / US | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06749189.4 | 31.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006US12387 | Priority number, date | US20050095786 | 31.03.2005 Original published format: US 95786 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006105509 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1864452 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04L12/413 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
H04L12/4013 (EP,US);
H04L12/413 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04L47/115 (EP,US);
H04L47/13 (EP,US);
H04L47/263 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PAKETFLUSSSTEUERUNG MITTELS STEUERUNG DER LÄNGE DER ZWISCHENPAKETLÜCKE | [2007/50] | English: | PACKET FLOW CONTROL BY CONTROLLING THE LENGTH OF THE INTER-PACKET GAP | [2007/50] | French: | CONTROLE DE FLUX DE PAQUETS PAR REGULATION DE LA LONGUEUR DE L'INTERVALLE ENTRE PAQUETS | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 18.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/06] | 03.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO9809408 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * page 10, line 16 - page 17, line 11; figures 3-7 * [I] 5,6,11-22; | [XI]US2004081090 (HARA TOSHIHIDE [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0062]; figures 4-9 * [I] 6,12-22; | [XI] - COMER D E ET AL, "A rate-based congestion avoidance and control scheme for packet switched networks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS. PARIS, MAY 28 - JUNE 1, 1990, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19900528), vol. CONF. 10, ISBN 0-8186-2048-X, pages 390 - 397, XP010019345 [X] 1-3,7-9 * figure 1 * * paragraph [05.1] * * paragraph [5.2.2] * * paragraph [5.3.2] * [I] 4-6,11-22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDCS.1990.89307 | [XI] - WADEKAR M ET AL, "Rate Control in Short Range 802.3 Interconnects", IEEE 802.3AR CONGESTION MANAGEMENT STUDY GROUP SEPTEMBER 2004 PLENARY MEETING, (20040927), pages 1 - 21, URL: http://grouper.ieee.org/groups/802/3/cm_study/public/september04/wadekar_03_0904.pdf, (20060816), XP002394874 [X] 1,7,12,17 * page 6 - page 7 * * page 21 * [I] 2-6,8-11,13-16,18-22 | [I] - HEDGE G ET AL, "IEEE 802 CMSG Tutorial", IEEE 802 PLENARY TUTORIALS, San Antonio, TX, US, (20041116), pages 1 - 41, URL: http://www.ieee802.org/802_tutorials/nov04/802_3_cmsg_tutorial_1104.pdf, (20060816), XP002394875 [I] 20-22 * page 11 - page 12 * * page 20 * * page 31 - page 40 * | [XI] - YANG C-Q ET AL, "A TAXONOMY FOR CONGESTION CONTROL ALGORITHMS IN PACKET SWITCHING NETWORKS", IEEE NETWORK, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19950701), vol. 9, no. 4, ISSN 0890-8044, pages 34 - 45, XP000526590 [X] 1-3,7-9 * figure 6 * [I] 4-6,10-22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.397042 | [PX] - MCALPINE G ET AL, "An Architecture for Congestion Management in Ethernet Clusters", PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED PROCESSING SYMPOSIUM, 2005. PROCEEDINGS. 19TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL DENVER, CO, USA 04-08 APRIL 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050404), ISBN 0-7695-2312-9, pages 211a - 211a, XP010785783 [PX] 1,7,12 * paragraph [0004]; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IPDPS.2005.88 |