EP1874857 - SILYLATED THERMOPLASTIC VULCANIZATE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Momentive Performance Materials Inc.s 187 Danbury Road Wilton, CT 06897-4122 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states Momentive Performance Materials Inc. 187 Danbury Road Wilton, CT 06897 / US | ||
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRISWOLD, Roy, Melvin 528 Victory Circle Ballston Spa, New York 12020 / US | 02 /
FAHRENKOPF, Timothy, J. 2 Prospect Hills Road Rensselaer, New York 12144 / US | 03 /
MCKEON, Francis, J. 5 Knolls Road Queensbury, NY 12804 / US | 04 /
RAMDATT, Philbert, E. 515 West 59th Street New York, New York 10019 / US | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06749533.3 | 07.04.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006US13091 | Priority number, date | US20050105971 | 14.04.2005 Original published format: US 105971 | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006113180 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1874857 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/54, C08L51/06 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
C08J3/246 (EP,US);
C08J3/24 (KR);
C08F287/00 (EP,US);
C08F297/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/22 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US);
C08L51/06 (KR);
C08L53/025 (EP,US);
C09J123/22 (EP,US);
C09J151/04 (EP,US);
C09J153/025 (EP,US);
C08K5/54 (EP,US);
C08L23/0853 (EP,US);
C08L2312/00 (EP,US);
C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/22, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L53/025, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L53/025, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L53/025, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C09J123/22, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09J151/04, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C09J151/04, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C09J151/04, C08L2666/24 (EP,US);
C09J153/025, C08L2666/02 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SILYLIERTES THERMOPLASTISCHES VULKANISAT ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2008/02] | English: | SILYLATED THERMOPLASTIC VULCANIZATE COMPOSITIONS | [2008/02] | French: | PRÉPARATIONS DE VULCANISAT THERMOPLASTIQUE SILYLÉ | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 07.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/18] | 11.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0243206 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-20* example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9108257 (EXXON CHEMICAL LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 10; example -; claim - *; | [X]US5905106 (PRIGENT MADELEINE [FR], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 19; claim -; table - *; | [X]WO9967330 (WITCO CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]US6121354 (CHRONISTER MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-20 * example -; claim - *; | [DX]US6448343 (SCHOMBOURG JACQUES F [CH], et al) [DX] 1-20 * the whole document * |