EP1872642 - LAYERED LABEL STRUCTURE WITH TIMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVESO, INC. 5151 East River Road Suite 411 Fridley MN 55421 / US | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENNAZ, Thomas, J. 5117 Oxbow Place Champlin, Minnesota 55316 / US | 02 /
SIME, David, G. 5363 Ashcroft Road Minnetonka, Minnesota 55345 / US | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Needle, Jacqueline Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Needle, Jacqueline Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 06749621.6 | 10.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006US13236 | Priority number, date | US20050209345 | 22.08.2005 Original published format: US 209345 | US20050231360 | 19.09.2005 Original published format: US 231360 | US20050670076P | 11.04.2005 Original published format: US 670076 P | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006110622 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1872642 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/18, H05K7/06, // G09F3/02, G09F9/30 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
G09F9/30 (EP,US);
G04F13/04 (EP,US);
G09F3/0294 (EP,US);
G09F3/208 (EP,US);
H01M10/425 (EP,US);
H01M6/40 (EP,US);
H05K3/284 (EP,US);
H05K1/182 (EP,US);
H05K1/189 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10037 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10128 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1311 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/48] | H05K1/18, H05K7/06 | ||
Former IPC [2008/01] | H05K7/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETE LABEL-STRUKTUR MIT TIMER | [2008/01] | English: | LAYERED LABEL STRUCTURE WITH TIMER | [2008/01] | French: | STRUCTURE D'ETIQUETTE EN COUCHES AVEC INDICATEUR DE DUREE | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 07.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/02] | 11.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5802015 (ROTHSCHILD ALAN W [US], et al) [Y] 3-5,8,9,11-13,15-21 * column 5, line 17 - column 9, line 63; figure 7 *; | [Y]US6030474 (ISONO HAJIME [JP], et al) [Y] 10* column 5, line 16 - column 6, line 56; figure 5 *; | [XY]US2002167500 (GELBMAN ALEXANDER [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,14,22 * page 3, paragraph 0043 - page 18, paragraph 0140; figures 5,6 * [Y] 3-5,8-13,15-21; | [XPY]US2005134461 (GELBMAN ALEXANDER [US], et al) [XP] 1-9,11-22 * page 7, paragraph 0073 - page 10, paragraph 0105; figures 13-29 * [Y] 10 | International search | [X]US6700692 (TONAR WILLIAM L [US], et al); | [X]US2003048256 (SALMON PETER C [US]) |