EP1875236 - METHODS TO IDENTIFY COMPOUNDS USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF PROLIFERATIVE AND DIFFERENTIATIVE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CELGENE CORPORATION 86 Morris Avenue Summit, NJ 07901 / US | For all designated states NEW YORK UNIVERSITY 70 Washington Square New York, NY 10012 / US | [2008/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAGANO, Michele One Washington Square Village New York, New York 10012 / US | 02 /
MERCURIO, Frank 12740 Sand Crest Road San Diego, California 92130 / US | 03 /
XIE, Weilin 5375 Ruette De Mer San Diego, California 92130 / US | 04 /
LOPEZ-GIRONA, Antonia 8959 January Place San Diego, California 92122 / US | 05 /
PESCHIAROLI, Angelo IDI-IRCCS Biochemistry Lab. Univ.of Rome "Tor Vergata" Dep. of Experimental Medicine and Biochem.Sciences Via Montpellier 1 00133 Rome / IT | [2008/33] |
Former [2008/02] | 01 /
PAGANO, Michele One Washington Square Village New York, New York 10012 / US | ||
02 /
MERCURIO, Frank 12740 Sand Crest Road San Diego, California 92130 / US | |||
03 /
XIE, Weilin 5375 Ruette De Mer San Diego, California 92130 / US | |||
04 /
LOPEZ-GIRONA, Antonia 8959 January Place San Diego, California 92122 / US | |||
05 /
PESCHIAROLI, Angelo 303 East 71st Street, Apt. 1G New York, NY 10021 / US | Representative(s) | Weber, Martin, et al Jones Day Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Weber-Quitzau, Martin, et al Jones Day Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Hermann, Bettina Celia Jones Day Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06749829.5 | 11.04.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006US13576 | Priority number, date | US20050106014 | 13.04.2005 Original published format: US 106014 | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006113251 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1875236 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
G01N33/5023 (US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A61K38/02 (US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
G01N33/573 (EP,US);
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
G01N2333/4703 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Extension states | AL | 19.10.2007 | BA | 19.10.2007 | HR | 19.10.2007 | MK | 19.10.2007 | YU | 19.10.2007 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PROLIFERATIONS- UND DIFFERENZIERUNGSSTÖRUNGEN | [2010/21] | English: | METHODS TO IDENTIFY COMPOUNDS USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF PROLIFERATIVE AND DIFFERENTIATIVE DISORDERS | [2008/02] | French: | PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION DE COMPOSES UTILISES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES DE PROLIFERATION ET DE DIFFERENCIATION | [2008/02] |
Former [2008/02] | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PROLIFERATIONS- UND DIFFERENZIERUNGSSTÖRUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 21.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/10] | 22.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 05.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0012679 (UNIV NEW YORK [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,17,18,20 * claims 13-16,19 * * page 49, line 4 - line 32 * * page 50, line 16 - line 20 * * page 50, line 35 - line 36 * * page 52, line 13 - line 19 * * SEQ ID No: 58 has 100.00 % identity (100.00 % ungapped) over 327 (q:s=1-327:1-327) with subject GSP:AAY83092 disclosed in patent WO0012679 published on 20000309. *; | [A] - CENCIARELLI C ET AL, "Identification of a family of human F-box proteins.", CURRENT BIOLOGY : CB. 21 OCT 1999, (19991021), vol. 9, no. 20, ISSN 0960-9822, pages 1177 - 1179, XP002399929 [A] 1,2,6,7,17,18,20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(00)80020-2 | [A] - JIN JIANPING ET AL, "Systematic analysis and nomenclature of mammalian F-box proteins.", GENES & DEVELOPMENT. 1 NOV 2004, (20041101), vol. 18, no. 21, ISSN 0890-9369, pages 2573 - 2580, XP002399930 [A] 1,2,6,7,17,18,20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.1255304 | by applicant | WO8809810 | US4873191 | WO8910134 | WO9011364 | WO9105058 | WO9320242 | WO9418318 | WO0012679 | - HUNTER; PINES, CELL, (1994), vol. 79, page 573 | - SHERR; ROBERTS, GENES DEV., (1999), vol. 13, page 1501 | - CIECHANOVER, EMBO J., (1998), vol. 17, page 7151 | - SPATARO, BR. J CANCER, (1998), vol. 77, page 448 | - BROWN; PAGANO, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1997), vol. 1332, page 1 | - PEIFER, SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 275, page 1752 | - LLOYD, AM. J. PATHOL., (1999), vol. 154, page 313 | - JANKNECHT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, page 8972 | - VAN DER PUTTEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 6148 | - THOMPSON ET AL., CELL, (1989), vol. 56, page 313 | - LO, MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 3, page 1803 | - LAVITRANO ET AL., CELL, (1989), vol. 57, page 717 | - GORDON, "Transgenic Animals", INTL. REV. CYTOL., (1989), vol. 115, page 171 | - CAMPBELL ET AL., NATURE, (1996), vol. 380, page 64 | - WILMUT ET AL., NATURE, vol. 385, page 810 | - PAGANO, Cell Cycle: Materials and Methods, SPRING-VERLAG, (1995), pages 217 - 281 | - NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, vol. 90, page 11708 | - BRENNER; LERNER, PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, page 5381 | - SCOTT; SMITH, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, page 386 | - DEVLIN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, page 404 | - CHRISTIAN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 227, page 711 | - LENSTRA, J. IMMUNOL. METH., (1992), vol. 152, page 149 | - KAY ET AL., GENE, (1993), vol. 128, page 59 | - MATTHEALDS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, page 9022 | - BUNIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, page 4708 | - SIMON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, page 9367 | - OSTRESH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, page 11138 | - LETSINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. U.S.A., (1989), vol. 86, page 6553 | - LEMAITRE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. U.S.A., (1987), vol. 84, page 648 | - KROL ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 958 - 976 | - ZON, PHARM. RES., (1988), vol. 5, page 539 | - GAUTIER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1987), vol. 15, page 6625 | - INOUE ET AL., NUCI. ACIDS RES., (1987), vol. 15, page 6131 | - INOUE ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1987), vol. 215, page 327 | - BERNOIST; CHAMBON, NATURE, (1981), vol. 290, page 304 | - YAMAMOTO ET AL., CELL, (1980), vol. 22, page 787 | - WAGNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. U.S.A., (1981), vol. 78, page 1441 | - BRINSTER ET AL., NATURE, (1982), vol. 296, page 39 | - SARVER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, page 1222 |