EP1886000 - DETECTION OF GAS TURBINE AIRFOIL FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy, Inc. 4400 Alafaya Trail Orlando, FL 32826-2399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states Siemens Energy, Inc. 4400 Alafaya Trail Orlando FL 32826-2399 / US | ||
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states Siemens Power Generation, Inc. 4400 Alafaya Trail Orlando FL 32826-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUMMEL, Hans-Gerd Johann Popitzweg 9 13627 Berlin / DE | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/36] | McGowan, Nigel George Siemens Shared Services Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/07] | McGowan, Nigel George Siemens Corporate Shared Services Siemens AG P.O. Box 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06749976.4 | 13.04.2006 | [2008/07] | WO2006US13782 | Priority number, date | US20050135114 | 23.05.2005 Original published format: US 135114 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006127159 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1886000 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01D21/00, F01D21/12, F01D21/14, F01D5/18 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
F01D21/12 (EP,US);
F01D21/003 (EP,US);
F01D21/14 (EP,US);
F01D5/189 (EP,US);
F05D2260/201 (EP,US);
F05D2270/301 (EP,US);
F05D2270/3015 (EP,US);
F05D2270/303 (EP,US);
F05D2270/3032 (EP,US);
F05D2300/611 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/25] |
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERFASSUNG DES VERSAGENS EINER GASTURBINENSCHAUFEL | [2008/07] | English: | DETECTION OF GAS TURBINE AIRFOIL FAILURE | [2008/07] | French: | DETECTION DE DEFAILLANCE DE PALES DE ROTOR DE TURBINE A GAZ | [2008/07] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 28.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/49] | 21.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005042075 (YANG WEN-CHING [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0029] * * abstract *; | [X]US6062811 (ZOMBO PAUL J [US], et al) [X] 1,13,19 * column 2, line 1 - line 17 * * column 4, line 16 - line 45 * * column 5, line 18 - line 43 * * abstract *; | [A]GB1499550 (BBC SULZER TURBOMASCHINEN) [A] 1,2,4-6,9-14,17-22 * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 69 * |