EP1874143 - EQUESTRIAN RIDING BREECHES GARMENT AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FITS Riding, Ltd., Co. 261 Arbor Terrace Aiken, SC 29801 / US | [2016/08] |
Former [2015/34] | For all designated states FITS Riding, Ltd., Co. 261 Arbor Terrace Aiken, SC 29801 / US | ||
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states Fun In The Saddle, Inc. 6675 SW Moonshadow Ct. Portland OR 97223 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rudolph, Sheryl 6675 SW Moonshadow Ct. Portland, OR 97223 / US | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/16] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters 15 Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | ||
Former [2008/02] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 06750076.9 | 12.04.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006US13915 | Priority number, date | US20050198075 | 05.08.2005 Original published format: US 198075 | US20050671964P | 15.04.2005 Original published format: US 671964 P | US20050683212P | 20.05.2005 Original published format: US 683212 P | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006113371 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1874143 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1874143 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/00 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
A41D1/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2008/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | REITHOSE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/02] | English: | EQUESTRIAN RIDING BREECHES GARMENT AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE | [2008/02] | French: | CULOTTE D'EQUITATION ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 12.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 12.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.10.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 12.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 12.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.10.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.04.2006 | AT | 24.02.2016 | BE | 24.02.2016 | CY | 24.02.2016 | CZ | 24.02.2016 | EE | 24.02.2016 | ES | 24.02.2016 | FI | 24.02.2016 | IS | 24.02.2016 | IT | 24.02.2016 | LT | 24.02.2016 | LV | 24.02.2016 | MC | 24.02.2016 | NL | 24.02.2016 | PL | 24.02.2016 | RO | 24.02.2016 | SI | 24.02.2016 | SK | 24.02.2016 | TR | 24.02.2016 | LU | 12.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | BG | 24.05.2016 | GR | 25.05.2016 | PT | 24.06.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 12.04.2006 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 12.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.04.2006 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 12.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 12.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 12.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 12.04.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5210877 (NEWMAN HOWARD J [US]) [X] 16,17,21 * column 2, lines 3-20; figure 5 * * column 3, lines 47-53; claim 5 *; | [A]DE29621763U (FRAHM LEDERWAREN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1* figure 1; claims 1-5 *; | [XI]DE29923084U (JEUTTER WILFRIED [DE]) [X] 1,4,27 * page 1; figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 2,3,5-15,18-20,22-26,28-30; | [X]DE20313552U (CAVALLO ALBERT SAHLE GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 16,17 * paragraph [0016]; figures 1,2; claim 115 * | International search | [A]US4688269 (MAESHIMA SEIICHI [JP]); | [A]US4700407 (MATTILA HEIKKI [FI]); | [X]US5038408 (DEBAENE DAVID N [US]); | [X]US5210877 (NEWMAN HOWARD J [US]) |