EP1893808 - MULTI-PLY PAPER TOWEL WITH ABSORBENT CORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP 133 Peachtree Street, N.E. Atlanta GA 30303 / US | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDWARDS, Steven, L. 9539 Tri-county Road Fremont, WI 54940 / US | 02 /
SUPER, Guy, H. W6881 Firelane 4 Menasha, WI 54952 / US | 03 /
MCCULLOUGH, Stephen, J. W2260 State Road 23 Mount Calvary, WI 53057 / US | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/10] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06750109.8 | 13.04.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006US13973 | Priority number, date | US20050673492P | 21.04.2005 Original published format: US 673492 P | US20060402609P | 12.04.2006 Original published format: US 402609 P | [2008/12] |
Former [2008/10] | US20050673492P | 21.04.2005 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006115817 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1893808 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1893808 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B31F1/07, D21H27/30 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
D21H27/30 (EP,US);
B31F1/07 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0743 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0756 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0764 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0766 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0784 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0787 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0789 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/10] | D21H23/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Title | German: | MEHRLAGIGES PAPIERHANDTUCH MIT ABSORBIERENDEM KERN | [2008/10] | English: | MULTI-PLY PAPER TOWEL WITH ABSORBENT CORE | [2008/10] | French: | PAPIER HYGIENIQUE A PLIS MULTIPLES COMPRENANT UN NOYAU ABSORBANT | [2008/10] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 22.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13150443.3 / EP2581213 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2006 | AT | 05.06.2013 | BE | 05.06.2013 | CY | 05.06.2013 | CZ | 05.06.2013 | DK | 05.06.2013 | EE | 05.06.2013 | FI | 05.06.2013 | LT | 05.06.2013 | LV | 05.06.2013 | MC | 05.06.2013 | NL | 05.06.2013 | PL | 05.06.2013 | RO | 05.06.2013 | SI | 05.06.2013 | SK | 05.06.2013 | TR | 05.06.2013 | BG | 05.09.2013 | GR | 06.09.2013 | IS | 05.10.2013 | PT | 07.10.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 13.04.2006 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | IT | 13.04.2013 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 05.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2004033793 (FORT JAMES CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8,12-16 * page 14, paragraph last - page 16; claims 132-142 * * page 2, paragraph first * * page 6, paragraph last - page 7, paragraph first * [Y] 11 [I] 2-21; | [Y]US2004250969 (LUU PHUONG V [US], et al) [Y] 11 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5277761 (PHAN DEAN VAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2003021952 (ZINK RONALD JOSEPH [US], et al); | [Y]US2001008180 (ANDERSON RALPH L [US], et al); | [Y]US5137600 (BARNES HAROLD K [US], et al); | [Y]US2004226673 (EDWARDS STEVEN L [US], et al) | by applicant | US7399378 | US6379496 |