EP1887990 - INSTRUMENTS FOR POSITIONING IMPLANTS INTO A SPINAL DISC SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/08] | INSTRUMENTS, IMPLANTS AND METHODS FOR POSITIONING IMPLANTS INTO A SPINAL DISC SPACE | ||
[2009/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc. 2500 Silveus Crossing Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DERIDDER, Steven, D. 6255 Skylight Drive Bartlett, Tennessee 38135 / US | 02 /
LIM, Roy, K. 7273 Great Oaks Road Germantown, Tennessee 38138 / US | [2010/13] |
Former [2008/08] | 01 /
DERIDDER, Steven, D. 7273 Great Oaks Road Germantown, Tennessee 38138 / US | ||
02 /
LIM, Roy, K. 6255 Skylight Drive Bartlett, Tennessee 38135 / US | Representative(s) | Kühn, Armin, et al Viering, Jentschura & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kühn, Armin, et al Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/08] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06750362.3 | 14.04.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006US14301 | Priority number, date | US20050107192 | 15.04.2005 Original published format: US 107192 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006113562 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1887990 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1887990 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/46, A61F2/44 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
A61F2/4465 (EP,US);
A61F2/46 (KR);
A61F2/44 (KR);
A61F2/4611 (EP,US);
A61F2/4603 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30133 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30538 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30593 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30772 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30787 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30843 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4627 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSTRUMENTE ZUR POSITIONIERUNG VON IMPLANTATEN IN EINEM BANDSCHEIBENRAUM | [2009/44] | English: | INSTRUMENTS FOR POSITIONING IMPLANTS INTO A SPINAL DISC SPACE | [2009/44] | French: | INSTRUMENTS DE POSITIONNEMENT D'IMPLANTS DANS UN ESPACE DE DISQUE VERTÉBRAL | [2009/44] |
Former [2008/08] | INSTRUMENTE, IMPLANTATE UND VERFAHREN ZUR POSITIONIERUNG VON IMPLANTATEN IN EINEM BANDSCHEIBENRAUM | ||
Former [2008/08] | INSTRUMENTS, IMPLANTS AND METHODS FOR POSITIONING IMPLANTS INTO A SPINAL DISC SPACE | ||
Former [2008/08] | INSTRUMENTS, IMPLANTS ET MÉTHODES DE POSITIONNEMENT D'IMPLANTS DANS UN ESPACE DE DISQUE VERTÉBRAL | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09153289.5 / EP2062555 | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.06.2010 | BE | 09.06.2010 | CY | 09.06.2010 | CZ | 09.06.2010 | DK | 09.06.2010 | EE | 09.06.2010 | FI | 09.06.2010 | HU | 09.06.2010 | IT | 09.06.2010 | LT | 09.06.2010 | LV | 09.06.2010 | NL | 09.06.2010 | PL | 09.06.2010 | RO | 09.06.2010 | SE | 09.06.2010 | SI | 09.06.2010 | SK | 09.06.2010 | TR | 09.06.2010 | BG | 09.09.2010 | GR | 10.09.2010 | ES | 20.09.2010 | IS | 09.10.2010 | PT | 11.10.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BE | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
HU | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
TR | 09.06.2010 | ||
BG | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BE | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
TR | 09.06.2010 | ||
BG | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BE | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
BG | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BE | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
DK | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BE | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
LV | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03037228 (OSTEOTECH INC [US]) [X] 1,7,8,13 * paragraph [0170] - paragraph [0176] * * paragraph [0190] - paragraph [0205] * * figures 21-23,57-60,65,67 *; | [A]US2004153065 (LIM ROY K [US]) [A] * abstract ** figures 11-16 *; | [X]US2005038431 (BARTISH CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8,10,11,13,14 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033] * * figures 1-8 * |