EP1877230 - PAPER TOWEL DISPENSER APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dispensing Dynamics International 1020 Bixby Drive City of Industry CA 91745 / US | [2011/25] |
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states Perrin Manufacturing Company 601 University Avenue, Suite 278 Sacramento, California 95825 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CVJETKOVIC, Niko A. 601 University Avenue, Suite 278 Sacramento, California 95825 / US | 02 /
KEILY, Joel P. 601 University Avenue, Suite 278 Sacramento, CA 95825 / US | 03 /
PERRIN, Patrick C. 601 University Avenue, Suite 278 Sacramento, CA 95825 / US | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Einsel, Martin Patentanwälte Einsel & Kollegen Jasperallee 1a 38102 Braunschweig / DE | [2016/43] |
Former [2011/25] | Einsel, Martin Patentanwälte Einsel & Kollegen Jasperallee 1a 38102 Braunschweig / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/03] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06750760.8 | 19.04.2006 | [2008/03] | WO2006US14796 | Priority number, date | US20050114860 | 25.04.2005 Original published format: US 114860 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006115952 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1877230 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1877230 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/62, A47K10/38, B26F3/02 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
B26F3/02 (EP,US);
A47K10/38 (EP,US);
A47K2010/3675 (EP,US);
A47K2010/3863 (EP,US);
A47K2010/3881 (EP,US);
Y10T225/12 (EP,US);
Y10T225/321 (EP,US);
Y10T225/393 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4769 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4783 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4804 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4812 (EP,US);
Y10T83/896 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/03] | B26D1/62, A47K10/38 | ||
Former IPC [2008/03] | B26D1/62 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/43] |
Former [2008/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PAPIERHANDTUCHAUSGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2008/03] | English: | PAPER TOWEL DISPENSER APPARATUS | [2008/03] | French: | APPAREIL DISTRIBUTEUR D'ESSUIE-TOUT | [2008/03] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 12.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.04.2006 | AT | 26.10.2016 | BE | 26.10.2016 | CY | 26.10.2016 | CZ | 26.10.2016 | DK | 26.10.2016 | EE | 26.10.2016 | ES | 26.10.2016 | FI | 26.10.2016 | LT | 26.10.2016 | LV | 26.10.2016 | MC | 26.10.2016 | NL | 26.10.2016 | PL | 26.10.2016 | RO | 26.10.2016 | SE | 26.10.2016 | SI | 26.10.2016 | SK | 26.10.2016 | TR | 26.10.2016 | BG | 26.01.2017 | GR | 27.01.2017 | IS | 26.02.2017 | PT | 27.02.2017 | IE | 19.04.2017 | LU | 19.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.04.2006 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.04.2006 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 26.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5207633 (GRANGER MAURICE [FR]) [Y] 1-10* the whole document *; | [Y]US6314850 (MORAND MICHEL [CA]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US6314850 (MORAND MICHEL [CA]) | by applicant | US5207633 | US6314850 |