EP1880273 - AUCTION SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SELECTING INSERTS FOR DIRECT MAILINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states First Data Corporation 12500 East Belford Avenue Englewood, CO 80112-5939 / US | [2008/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PROVOST, Christina 13668 Larimore Avenue Omaha, Nebraska 68164 / US | 02 /
OSWALD, Dan 510 North Fillmore Papillion, Nebraska 68046 / US | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06750931.5 | 21.04.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006US15043 | Priority number, date | US20050115079 | 25.04.2005 Original published format: US 115079 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006116050 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1880273 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, B65H33/04, B07C5/00 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
G06Q30/08 (EP,US);
G06Q10/107 (EP,US);
G06Q30/00 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/04] | G06F7/00, B65H33/04, B07C5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUKTIONSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL VON BEILAGEN FÜR DIREKTPOSTSENDUNGEN | [2008/04] | English: | AUCTION SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SELECTING INSERTS FOR DIRECT MAILINGS | [2008/04] | French: | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE VENTE AUX ENCHERES POUR SELECTIONNER DES ENCARTS POUR PUBLIPOSTAGE DIRECT | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 30.11.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004204789 (PROVOST CHRISTINA [US], et al) [X] 1-20* the whole document * | International search | [A]US2004007510 (KECHEL OTTMAR K [US]); | [A]US2005261801 (SMITH SCOTT J [US], et al); | [A]US2006102531 (CONARD WALTER S [US], et al) |