EP1872600 - SYSTEM AND MEHTOD FOR CONFIGURING AN RFID READER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SkyeTek, Inc. 11030 Circle Point Road, Suite 300 Westminster, CO 80020 / US | [2008/28] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states Skyetek, Inc 11030 Circle Point Road, Suite 300 Westminster, Colorado 80020 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOVING, Sean P. O. Box 1122 Boulder Colorado 80306 / US | 02 /
CHAN, Christopher 1320 Hickory Drive Erie, Colorado 80516 / US | 03 /
MAJHI, Rohit 1140 11th Street Boulder, Colorado 80302 / US | 04 /
ENWALL, Tim 172 Tall Pine Lane Boulder, Colorado 80302 / US | [2008/27] |
Former [2008/01] | 01 /
LOVING, Sean 751 Cleveland Circle Lafayette, Colorado 80026 / US | ||
02 /
CHAN, Christopher 1320 Hickory Drive Erie, Colorado 80516 / US | |||
03 /
MAJHI, Rohit 1140 11th Street Boulder, Colorado 80302 / US | |||
04 /
ENWALL, Tim 172 Tall Pine Lane Boulder, Colorado 80302 / US | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2008/01] | Hössle Kudlek & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06751147.7 | 21.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006US15343 | Priority number, date | US20050673692P | 21.04.2005 Original published format: US 673692 P | US20050712957P | 31.08.2005 Original published format: US 712957 P | US20050301396 | 13.12.2005 Original published format: US 301396 | US20050301423 | 13.12.2005 Original published format: US 301423 | US20050301587 | 13.12.2005 Original published format: US 301587 | US20050301770 | 13.12.2005 Original published format: US 301770 | US20050323214 | 30.12.2005 Original published format: US 323214 | US20060328209 | 09.01.2006 Original published format: US 328209 | US20060387421P | 23.03.2006 Original published format: US 387421 P | US20060387422P | 23.03.2006 Original published format: US 387422 P | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006116236 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1872600 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q5/22 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP);
G06Q10/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM KONFIGURIEREN EINES RFID-LESERS | [2008/01] | English: | SYSTEM AND MEHTOD FOR CONFIGURING AN RFID READER | [2008/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE CONFIGURATION D'UN LECTEUR RFID | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4924210 (MATSUI KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [X]US5777561 (CHIEU TRIEU CAN [US], et al) [X] 1* column W *; | [X]DE29814988U (MOBA MOBILE AUTOMATION GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6172609 (LU GUIYANG [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 47 - line 58 *; | [X]WO0182213 (SENSORMATIC ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [X] 1-7,10,15 * page 3, line 14 - line 24 *; | [X]US2003214389 (ARNESON MICHAEL R [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0152] - paragraph [0158] * | International search | [X]US5013898 (GLASSPOOL ANDREW J K [GB]); | [X]US6617962 (HORWITZ CLIFFORD A [CA], et al) |