EP1889512 - IMPLANTABLE HEARING AID ACTUATOR POSITIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cochlear Limited 1 University Avenue Macquarie University, NSW 2109 / AU | [2013/07] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states Otologics, LLC 5445 Airport Boulevard Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | ||
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Otologics, LLC 5445 Airport Boulevard, Suite 106 Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALDMANN, Bernd Im Spycher 2 8124 Maur / CH | [2008/27] |
Former [2008/08] | 01 /
WALDMANN, Bernd 3390 Cripple Creek Trail Boulder, Colorado 80305 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/08] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06751672.4 | 26.04.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006US16064 | Priority number, date | US20050115436 | 27.04.2005 Original published format: US 115436 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006116619 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1889512 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1889512 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
H04R25/30 (EP,US);
H04R25/606 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Title | German: | POSITIONIERUNG EINES AKTUATORS EINES IMPLANTIERBAREN HÖRGERÄTS | [2013/08] | English: | IMPLANTABLE HEARING AID ACTUATOR POSITIONING | [2008/08] | French: | POSITIONNEMENT D'ACTIONNEUR DE PROTHESE AUDITIVE IMPLANTABLE | [2008/08] |
Former [2008/08] | AKTOR-POSITIONIERUNG EINES IMPLANTIERBAREN HÖRGERÄTS | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 28.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2010 | 30.04.2012 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   24.10.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2006 | AT | 30.10.2013 | BE | 30.10.2013 | BG | 30.10.2013 | CY | 30.10.2013 | CZ | 30.10.2013 | DK | 30.10.2013 | EE | 30.10.2013 | ES | 30.10.2013 | FI | 30.10.2013 | IT | 30.10.2013 | LT | 30.10.2013 | LV | 30.10.2013 | MC | 30.10.2013 | NL | 30.10.2013 | PL | 30.10.2013 | RO | 30.10.2013 | SE | 30.10.2013 | SI | 30.10.2013 | SK | 30.10.2013 | TR | 30.10.2013 | GR | 31.01.2014 | IS | 28.02.2014 | PT | 28.02.2014 | GB | 26.04.2014 | IE | 26.04.2014 | LU | 26.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 26.04.2006 | |
AT | 30.10.2013 | ||
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 26.04.2014 | ||
IE | 26.04.2014 | ||
LU | 26.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 26.04.2014 | ||
IE | 26.04.2014 | ||
LU | 26.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 26.04.2014 | ||
IE | 26.04.2014 | ||
LU | 26.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 26.04.2014 | ||
IE | 26.04.2014 | ||
LU | 26.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 26.04.2014 | ||
LU | 26.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 26.04.2014 | ||
LU | 26.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 26.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 26.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 30.10.2013 | |
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 30.10.2013 | |
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 30.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002048374 (SOLI SIGFRID [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * paragraphs [0025] , [0029] , [0047] *; | [A]US2003163021 (MILLER DOUGLAS ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * paragraphs [0008] - [0018] - [0053]; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]US6712754 (MILLER DOUGLAS ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * column 2, lines 60-67; figures 1,3,4, ** column 7, line 59 - column 10, line 42 * | International search | [X]US6712754 (MILLER DOUGLAS ALAN [US], et al) |